BNP Paribas v. City of Centennial, The
Plaintiff: BNP Paribas
Defendant: City of Centennial, The
Case Number: 1:2011cv01805
Filed: July 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 75 Stipulated Motion for One-Week Extension of Stay Pending Completion of Settlement Agreement. All deadlines and rulings on pending motions in this case are stayed through and including 7/12/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/2/12.(mnfsl, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 72 Stipulated Motion to Stay Action Pending Completion of Settlement Agreement. All deadlines and rulings on pending motions are stayed through and including 7/5/2012. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/17/2012 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/5/12.(pabcd)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/8/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/18/12.(mnfsl, )
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 60 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Amendment to Scheduling Order. The deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is extended to 5/9/2012 and the discovery cut-off is extended to 6/2/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/2/12.(mnfsl, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 56 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Court Order Requiring Production of Certain Sales Tax Reports, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/12/2012.(mjwcd)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 29 . Discovery due by 5/2/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/26/2012.(mjwcd)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 17 Motion to Quash; granting 20 Motion for Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/21/11.(jjpsl, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 36 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. First Amended Complaint (36-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/3/2011.(mjwcd)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNP Paribas v. City of Centennial, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNP Paribas
Represented By: Brandee L. Caswell
Represented By: Amber Lane Abbuhl
Represented By: David W. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Centennial, The
Represented By: Lila Marie Bateman
Represented By: Dean Ceon Heizer, II
Represented By: Kevin Carter Paul
Represented By: Edward T. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?