Young v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tayna Young
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01840
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 444 JUDGMENT in favor of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. against Tanya Young, by Clerk on 3/31/2014. (trlee, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER, re 441 and 442 , All future hearings and deadlines set before Judge Raymond P. Moore are hereby VACATED. Judgment to enter. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/28/2014. (trlee, )
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting 432 Motion for Joinder of twenty-four opt-in plaintiffs. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/29/2013.(trlee, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER RE: JOINT MOTION TO AMEND ORDER DECERTIFYING COLLECTIVE ACTION. by Judge Raymond P. Moore, nunc pro tunc 8/27/2013.(trlee, )
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting 421 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment as to 568 Opt-In Plaintiffs. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/25/13. (alvsl)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting 423 Motion for Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/27/2013.(rmcd)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MINUTE ORDER granting 403 Defendant's Motion for Clarification of the Court's April 16, 2013 Minute Order. Status Conference remains set 6/13/2013 09:00 AM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/16/2013.(mjwcd)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MINUTE ORDER denying 383 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Compliance with theCourt's February 14, 2013 Amended Scheduling Order [docket no. 374]; denying 391 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Compliance with the Court's February 22, 201 3 Order Regarding Defendant's Motion to Require Plaintiff to Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 Service Requirements with Respect to Conditional Certification Notice Procedure [docket no. 379], by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/2/2013.(mjwcd)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 258 Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs Travis Neria, Jamie Ruse, Johnny Roldan, and Denise Susterich and Memorandum of Law in Support. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/13. (kfinn, )
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting 337 Defendant's Motion to Require Plaintiff to Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 Service Requirements with Respect to Conditional Certification Notice Procedures, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/2013.(mjwcd)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER APPROVING FORM OF WRITTEN EXPLANATION. 327 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing is APPROVED. The corrected Consent to Become Party Plaintiff form and the written explanation of the corrected Consent to Become Party Plaintiff form SHALL BE MAIL ED as required in the court's Order Concerning Defendant's Emergency Motions [#313]. The deadline for the return of a corrected and executed Consent to Become Party Plaintiff form to counsel for the plaintiff or the class administrator SHALL BE 1/21/2013. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/7/2012. (klyon, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 295 Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Pre-Attorney-Client Relationship Communications, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/2012.(mjwcd)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 328 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2012. It is determined that entering an Amended Scheduling Order is premature. Deadline to file new pro posed Amended Scheduling Order is 2/11/2013. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Granting 323 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Compliance with the Court's November 9, 2012 [D.E.311] on Defendant's Motion to Compel. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MINUTE ORDER granting 320 Unopposed Motion for Clarification and/or To Appear Telephonically for Scheduling Conference Set on November 27, 2012. All counsel may participate in the Scheduling Conference 11/27/2012 10:00 AM by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/26/2012.(mjwcd)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTIONS. Granting in part 293 Defendant's Emergency Motion for Order To Plaintiff To Cease and Desist Unauthorized and Misleading Communications Regarding Notice of the Collective Action; granting i n part 304 Defendant's Emergency Motion To Compel Compliance With The Court's Order Granting Conditional Certification and for Sanctions and Other Remedies. See order for further details. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/13/12. (kfinn, )
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 290 Motion to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/9/12. See order for further information. (kfinn, )
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION. Granting in part and denying in part 283 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Clarification and To Extend Notice Period, Permit Email Notice, and Allow for Reminder Notice. The notice per iod specified in the Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification 264 is EXTENDED to 12/10/2012; Order 264 is AMENDED accordingly, but otherwise SHALL REMAIN in full force and effect. All consent-to-join forms SHALL BE RETURNED to plaintiffs counsel no later than 12/10/2012. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/4/2012.(kfinn, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS in Support of Plaintiff's Motions for Certification 121 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/27/12.(kfinn, )
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER denying 139 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses to 28 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/26/12. (alvsl)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTE ORDER granting 103 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Brief Enlargement of Time To Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Permitting Supervised Notice of this Action and Conditional Certification of this Case as a Collective Action ; granting 112 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation in Filing Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant' s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Incorportated Memorandum of Law and Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Prmitting Supervised Notice of this Action to Potential Opt-in Plaintiffs and Conditional Certifi cation of this Case as a Collective Action and Incorportated Memorandum of Law (sic); Denying 135 Defendant Dollar Tree Stores Inc.s Motion for eave to File a Sur-reply in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Class and Collective Certification; denying 175 Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument. The replies [# 118 ] and [# 119 ] filed by the plaintiff are accepted as timely filed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/12/2012.(klyon, )
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Sixteen (16) day Jury Trial set for 3/4/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/24/12. (rebsec, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS 168 to Order 161 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/12. (mjgsl, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2012.Granting 206 Motion for Extension of Time. Granting 223 Motion for Extension of Time. Granting 229 Motion to C ompel. Discovery due by 10/29/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2012. Scheduling Order 48 is amended. Fax transmission to chambers of correspondence is filed as Restricted Level 1. Final Pretrial Conference 9/7/2012 09:00 AM; Trial Preparation Conference 9/14/2012 04:00 PM is vacated; Jury Trial 10/1/2012 08:30 AM are vacated. 7/19/2012 counsel shall call chambers of Judge Blackburn to reset these. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER granting 224 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; granting 225 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Amending The Court's October 20,2011 Scheduling Order (docket no. 48). Scheduling Order 48 is amended accordingly, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/5/2012.(mjwcd)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE ORDER deeming withdrawn 215 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Opt- In Plaintiff Keisha Miller's Second Request to Produce, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/29/2012.(wjcsl, )
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE ORDER 169 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Location of Opt-In Plaintiffs' Depositions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Motion for Protective Order is MOOT and therefore DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/2/12.(mjgsl, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Defendant's Motion to Compel Production and for Contempt of Court. The motion is GRANTED with respect to compelling the disputed documents and the motion is DENIED as to holding deponents in contempt of court. That 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Designate All Experts is GRANTED. Discovery due by 6/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/23/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying 149 Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Location of Depositions, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/14/2012.(mjwcd)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.s Motion to Stay and Extend Time to Answer Plaintiffs Amended Complaint 76 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/13/2012.(sah, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.s Motion To Increase The Page Limit For its Briefs in Opposition To Plaintiffs Certification Motions 90 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/19/2011.(sah, )
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/15/2011. (sah, )
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/29/2011. Granting 70 Motion for Leave. ORDERED: Plaintiff to provide the defendant the current names, addresses and telephone numbers of the thirteen Declarants in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [Docket No. 43, Filed October 19, 2011] within the next two days. All depositions of the additional thirteen Declarants shall be completed by December 21, 2011. (FTR: Laura Galera) (lag)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. Plaintiffs Nunc Pro Tunc Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint and Memorandum of Law 30 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/18/2011.(sah, )
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/7/2011. (sah, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Exceed The Page Limitation in Filing Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Plaintiffs Motion For an Order Prmitting [sic] Supervised Notice of This Action To Pote ntial Opt-In Plaintiffs and Conditional Certification of This Case as Collective Action and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 42 filed 10/19/2011 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion for class certification may exceed the page limitations by fourteen (14) p ages, and Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 43 is accepted for filing. Plaintiffs Motion For an Order Permitting Supervised Notice of This Action To Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs and Conditional Certificatio n of This Case as a Collective Action and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 44 is accepted for filing. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.s Expedited Motion For an Extension ofTime To Respond To Plaintiffs Motion For Certification and For Other Relief 53 file d 10/27/2011, is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until 1/6/2012, in which to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 43 and Plaintiffs Motion For an Order Permitting Supervised Notice of This Action To Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs and Conditional Certification of This Case as a Collective Action and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 44 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/3/2011.(sah, )
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/14/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Sixteen (16) day Jury Trial set for 10/1/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/20/11. (rebsec, )
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 33 is STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/18/2011.(sah, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Dollar Stores, Inc.s Motion to Stay And Extend Time to Answer 18 is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference remains set on 10/20/2011, at 9:30 a.m. and the parties shall file their proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order with the court on or before 10/15/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/5/2011.(sah2, )
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayna Young
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?