Garcia v. Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office, The et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Garcia
Defendant: J. Grayson Robinson, David Walcher, Vince Line, Mark Campbell, David Wellman, Tom McNevin and Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office, The
Case Number: 1:2011cv01950
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/30/12. (alvsl)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against Defendants J. Grayson Robinson, Vince Line, and Mark Campell. The parties motion 99 is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims and complaint against Defendants Robinson, Line and Camp bell, in their individual capacities be and are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his/its own costs and fees, and that the case caption shall henceforth be amended to reflect the dismissal of said parties. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/05/12. (alvsl)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiffs First, Fifth and Sixth Claims, which are now dismissed with prejudice. The motion is denied as to plaintiffs Second, Third and Fourth claims, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/24/12.(alvsl)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/11/2012. Granting 58 Motion for Leave; Granting 66 Motion for Leave to Appear Counsel for Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Oral Motion to Dismiss Defendants and David Wellman and David Walcher is GRANTED. David Walcher (in his personal capacity) and David Wellman (in his personal capacity) terminated. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2012. The court GRANTS 37 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Discovery deadline shall be extended to 6/22/2012. The court will not extend any other deadlines nor will it grant other further extensions of time. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/3/12. Modified only as to correct the signature date. (cbssec)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/2/12. (cbssec)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Trial and Trial Preparation Conference. Five-day Jury Trial set for 10/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/21/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/26/11. (lsw, )
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 10/24/2011 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/18/11. (cbssec)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/28/2011. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Grayson Robinson
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walcher
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Line
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Campbell
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wellman
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom McNevin
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office, The
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Garcia
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?