Schmid v. Cornell Corrections of America et al
Plaintiff: Tony Schmid
Defendant: Timothy F. Lyden, Sunthanker, Kyros Ipaktchi, Cornell Corrections of America and Veach
Case Number: 1:2011cv02003
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Affirming 109 Report and Recommendations: Defendants Santhanbar and Schmidt are dismissed without prejudice and this case is dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/16/12.(dkals, )
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 the Motion to Strike Immaterial Matters Contained in Second Amended Complaint. Further, the following documents filed by Plaintiff are hereby STRICKEN: 86 "Second Amended Complaint," ; and 95 "Second Amended Complaint." 76 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint will serve as the operative pleading unless or until Plaintiff receives leave of Court to further amend his pleadings. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/24/2012. (mehcd)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff shall file a Certificate of Review on or before 7/30/12. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/26/12.(cmacd )
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER denying 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Procurement of Forms, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/27/2012. (mehcd)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Cornell Corrections of America and 53 Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Timothy F. Lyden, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/2/2012. (mehcd)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/23/12.(jjpsl, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Plaintiff's letter, construed as a motion to produce court documents. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiff a copy of the pending motion to dismiss 24 and an updated copy of the current docket sheet, which contains the contact information for all attorneys who have entered an appearance in this case. The Court reminds the Plaintiff that it is not required to provide him with copies of filed documents, and may not grant any future requests absent a showing of exceptional cause. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/9/2012. (mehcd)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/16/2011. (sah, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/9/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmid v. Cornell Corrections of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy F. Lyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunthanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyros Ipaktchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Corrections of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?