International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division v. Frontier Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc., Republic Airways Holdings, Inc. and FAPAInvest, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv02007
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re: 154 Status Report filed by Republic Airways Holdings, Inc., Frontier Airlines, Inc. That Defendants shall submit a brief addressing the issue of standing within 20 days of the date of this Order. Defendants' brief is limited to six (6) pages, excluding the certificate of service, and that Plaintiff may file any response brief within 14 days of the service of Defendants brief, also limited to six (6) pages, excluding the certificate of service. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/17/2014. (trlee, )
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 b)(6). The request for an additional Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the Union is granted under the conditions outlined above. The request for sanctions is denied. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/19/2013.(klyon, )
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting 82 Agreed Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/06/2012.(wjcsl, )
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Revise Scheduling Order. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter the First Amended Complaint located at Docket No. 59 -1, effective as of the date of this Order. Def endants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before 06/06/2012. Discovery cut-off remains set at 06/18/2012 and the dispositive motion deadline remains set at 07/18/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/22/2012.(wjcsl, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance by Frontier Airlines Pilots Association; granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 62 Non-Party Frontier Airline Pilots Association's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena in Part, or for Protective Order Motion to Compel. Discovery due by 6/18/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/16/2012.(wjcsl, )
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Disclosure Order Concerning Commercial Agreement Amendments 1 and 2; granting 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents; granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant FAPAInvest to Produce Financial Records, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/24/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's 2 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Claims One, Two, and Four of the Complaint are dismissed. All claims arising under 45 U.S.C. § 152, Ninth asserted against Defendant RAH are also dismissed. All other claims remain pending, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 03/29/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Agreed Joint Motion to Amend Protective Order. The 41 Protective Order is amended to include Interested Party Frontier Airlines Pilots Association as a party to the Protective Order, effective by entry of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/07/2012.(wjc, )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/13/2012. (klmcd, )
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Motion of Frontier Airline Pilots Association to Modify or Quash Subpoena, to the extent that FAPA shall produce documents in response to the subpoena at issue on or before 02/10/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/27/2012.(wjc, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Attorney Norman A. Quandt's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Frontier Airlines, Inc. and Republic Airways Holdings, Inc. Attorney Quandt is relieved of any further representation of Defendants, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/17/2011.(wjc, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/27/11. (msksec, )
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/29/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division v. Frontier Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Represented By: William Randell Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew John Rita
Represented By: Norman Allen Quandt
Represented By: Douglas Ward Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Airways Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Ward Hall
Represented By: Norman Allen Quandt
Represented By: Matthew John Rita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAPAInvest, LLC
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?