Kaplan v. Archer et al

Plaintiff: Marc Harris Kaplan
Defendant: William Trujillo, John W. Suthers, Kirk Stewart Samelson, Harold Butts, Terry Maketa, John W. Hickenlooper, Dan May, Michelle L. Archer and Karla Jean Hansen
Case Number: 1:2011cv02094
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 41 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendants' 23 , 25 motions to dismiss are granted and this case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/9/12.(mnfsl, )
January 23, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall docket the "Notice of Understanding and Intent with Claim of Right From the Office of the Director of the Trust" and the "Notice of Default, Dishonor, and Opportunity to Cure" in this action. To the extent these notices seek Court action, they are denied without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/23/12. (mnfsl, )
October 21, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Preliminary Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/21/2011.Denying 6 Motion for More Definite Statement; Denying 8 Motion for More Definite Statement. ORDERED: Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before November 10, 2011. (FTR: Laura Galera) (lag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan v. Archer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Trujillo
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Suthers
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Stewart Samelson
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Butts
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Maketa
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Hickenlooper
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan May
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Represented By: Amy R. Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L. Archer
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jean Hansen
Represented By: Skippere Stewart Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Harris Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?