United States of America v. Welch et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: James (I) D. Welch, Amra Welch, James D. Welch, CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc. and Colorado Department of Revenue
Case Number: 1:2011cv02292
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Confirming Sale of Real Property and for Distribution of Proceeds re 120 Motion for Order. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/17/2014. (athom, )
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting The United States' 114 Motion for Order of Foreclosure and Sale. This Order of Foreclosure and Sale is entered pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §§ 2001 and 2002 and 26 U.S.C. §§ 7402 and 7403. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/28/2014. (athom, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 101 Report and Recommendations, and granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/8/13.(dkals, )
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting 98 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference: the Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/13 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/13.(dkals, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Default Judgment against Celestial Pursuits Trust, Jim D. Welch, Executive Trustee by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/17/12.(dkals, )
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice and striking 73 Petition to Dismiss and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/10/12.(dkals, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 60 Report and Recommendations and denying 49 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/10/12.(dkals, )
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: 30 Clerks Entry of Default is stricken. 29 Motion for Entry of Default is denied. 39 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Plaintiff shall file proof of proper service by 11/1/12. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/12.(dkals, )
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Strike. Defendant J. Welch's Response to Motion for Default Judgment Against Jim D. Welch, as Executive Trustee of Celestial Pursuits Trust 43 , and Defendant J. Welch's Motion 44 are both STRICKEN from the record. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/26/12.(cmacd )
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Defendant James D. Welchs Motion to Serve Subpoena Via Certified Us [sic] Mail; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue four signed but otherwise blank subpoenas to Defendant James D. Welch, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/11/2012.(ervsl, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER denying 33 Motion Requesting Clarification and Motion to Compelby Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/12.(pabcd)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Party Colorado Department of Revenue terminated. Colorado Department of Revenue discharged from further liability and DISMISSED as party to this litigation, and that the caption on all subsequent filings shall reflect the removal of the Colorado Department of Revenue as a Defendant in this case. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/16/2011.(wjc, )
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/5/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/4/11.(mnfsl, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE/DISMISS. Defendant's 7 Motion for More Definite Statement is denied. Defendant's 8 Motion to Strike/Dismiss is denied. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/1/11.(mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Welch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Rick Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) D. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amra Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?