Henze v. Peyton School District 23JT
Plaintiff: Christine T. Henze
Defendant: Peyton School District 23JT
Case Number: 1:2011cv02310
Filed: September 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Approving 50 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The action is Dismissed With Prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/7/2012. (klyon, )
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel are instructed to contact the court's at (303) 335-2350 on 10/23/2012 at 10:00 a.m. to reschedule the trial preparation conference. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/12. (kfinn, )
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/15/11. (rebsec, )
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 11/15/2011 at 9:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/7/11. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henze v. Peyton School District 23JT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine T. Henze
Represented By: Donald Wayne Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton School District 23JT
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Benjamin Todd Figa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?