Foreman v. Western Freightways, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Damon Foreman
Defendant: Western Freightways, LLC and New Century Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02407
Filed: September 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/9/13. (msksec, )
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (# 51 , 52 ) is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the Defendants are entitled to judgment on Mr. Foreman's cla ims of hostile environment harassment based on race and his retaliation claims, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as his race discrimination claim premised upon his termination is sufficient to proceed to trial. The parties shall commence preparation of a Proposed Pretrial Order and shall jointly contact chambers to schedule a Final Pretrial Conference. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/1/13.(msksec, )
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cut-Off by Four Days to Complete Depositions. Discovery due by 11/30/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/26/2012. (klyon, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER; 45 Unoppposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Two Additional Depositions is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted leave to conduct the two depositions prior to the discovery cutoff on 11/26/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/2012.(klmcd, )
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Depose Corporate Representatives from Professional Transportation Brokers, Inc. and KCP Logistics, LLC. Defendants are granted leave to depose corporate representatives from Professional Transportation Brokers, Inc. and KCP Logistics, LLC prior to the discovery cutoff on 11/26/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/9/12.(mnfsl, )
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/10/2012.(wjcsl, )
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cut-Off and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/21/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/26/2012.(wjcsl, )
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/14/2012. (klmcd, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/23/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman v. Western Freightways, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Foreman
Represented By: Susan R. Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Freightways, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?