Kleinert et al v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: James Kleinert, Spirit Riders Foundation and David Glynn
Defendant: Kenneth Salazar, Robert Abbey, Steve Beverlin, Sally E. Wisely, Connie Clementson and Greg Shoop
Case Number: 1:2011cv02428
Filed: September 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 59 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/14/12.(sgrim)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Petitioners' and Federal Respondents' Amended Joint Case Management Plan for Petition for Review of Agency Action in Environmental Case, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/7/12. (lygsl, )
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint Case Management Plan for Petition for Review of Agency Action in Environmental Case (ORDER) Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/15/2012. Adm Defendants Brief due by 7/16/2012. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 7/30/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/9/12. (gmssl, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion for Clarification. Joint Case Management Plan is due 20 days after respondents file their answer or response to the petition, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/21/11.(gmssl, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER 33 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider is premature and unnecessary, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/1/11.(gmssl, )
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER The 31 Order of 10/25/11 is sealed, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/28/11. (gmssl, )
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER The 13 Order of Reference is vacated. Joint Case Management Plan to be submitted no later than 11/24/11, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/25/11. (gmssl, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/4/2011. (erv, )
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of Recusal. Granting 22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Recusal. File to be returned to clerk and case reassigned by random draw, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/27/11.(gmssl, )
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 7 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and will be deemed a request for a Preliminary Injunction hearing; The parties shall submit simultaneous briefing on the issue of standing in connection with Plain tiffs claims under the Wild Free-Roaming Horse and Burros Act and the National Environmental Protection Act by no later than close of business on Monday, September 26, 2011; and Upon receipt and review of the parties supplemental briefs, the Court will consider the propriety of setting this matter for an evidentiary hearing in connection with Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/19/2011. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleinert et al v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kleinert
Represented By: Diane Susan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit Riders Foundation
Represented By: Diane Susan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Glynn
Represented By: Diane Susan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Salazar
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Represented By: Joanna Kathryn Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Abbey
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Represented By: Joanna Kathryn Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Beverlin
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Represented By: Joanna Kathryn Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally E. Wisely
Represented By: Joanna Kathryn Brinkman
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Clementson
Represented By: Joanna Kathryn Brinkman
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Shoop
Represented By: Joanna Kathryn Brinkman
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?