Genberg v. Porter
Plaintiff: Carl Genberg
Defendant: Steven S. Porter
Case Number: 1:2011cv02434
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 18:1514
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 229 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/01/2015.(mdave, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER denying 226 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/24/2015.(mdave, )
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c); Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2015. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/18/2015. (mdave )
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: denying without prejudice 159 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting 174 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Steven S. Porter answer due 1/26/2015. Status Conference held on 1/16/2015: Discovery due by 8/14/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER granting 168 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File his Memorandum Contra Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. The Court will accept and consider the Plaintiffs response to the motion to dismiss, attached to the present motion at docket #168-2. Defendant may file a reply in support of his motion on or before January 21, 2015, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/7/2015.(evana, )
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for telephone Status Conference held on 12/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting 161 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED THAT a Status Conference is set for 1/16/ 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the responses to the subpoenas issued by the plaintiff are STAYED pending the Status Conference set for 1/16/2015. This includes the subpoena issued to Arnold & Porter LLP, as well as the other four subpoenas issued as referenced on the record. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying as moot 153 The Motion for Substitution as Co-Counsel of Record filed by Holly Sterrett, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2014.(evana, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 137 Genbergs Motion For Entry Of Judgment Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/26/2014.(evana, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. ORDERED that Genberg' s Motion To Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 107] is DENIED. ORDERED that Redlich's Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 84 is GRANTED, and Genbergs SOX claim against Redlich is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. OR DERED that Porter, Sperber, Bautista, Darnaud, Hoffman-Bray, and Gastone's Motion To Dismiss 85 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that Genberg's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment 92 is DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/25/13.(jjhsl, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER granting 86 Motion to Consider Attachments A and B by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/17/12.(jjhsl, )
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER. The parties' Joint Motion to Defer Determination of Motion to Refer and Order to Show Cause [ECF No. 60], filed February 28, 2012 is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Referring this Case to the Colo rado Bankruptcy Court [ECF No. 39], filed January 26, 2012, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The prior Order to Show Cause [ECF No. 40] is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference and Oral Argument [ECF No. 95], filed August 6, 2012 is DENIED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/16/12.(lag)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 the Joint Motion to Vacate Pre-Trial Schedule and Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order. The Settlement Conference set for 4/26/2012 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/18/2012. (mehcd)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Motion to Amend Response to Motions to Dismiss. The previously stricken Response [ECF No. 59] is now accepted for filing as Plaintiff's Amended Response by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/14/12.(jjhsl, )
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Referring This Case to the Colorado Bankruptcy Court. Defendants are ordered to refile their Surreply as a separate document by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/02/12.(jjhsl, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 50 the Joint Motion to Stay Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/27/2012. (mehcd)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Caption for First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. The Court accepts Plaintiff's proposed corrected pleading found at 13 , and directs the Plaintiff to file with the Court the Corrected First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (without the word, proposed, in the title) on or before 11/7/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/3/2011. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genberg v. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Genberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven S. Porter
Represented By: Edwin Packard Aro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?