Evans v. Central Intelligence Agency
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Evans
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 1:2011cv02544
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/2/14.(dkals, )
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/8/14. (msksec, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Freedom of Information Act, and Rule 7.1(a) Certification. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/26/2014.(klyon, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Freedom of Information Act, and Rule 7.1(a). Certification. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/13/2014.(klyon, )
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Freedom of Information Act. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/11/12.(mjgsl, )
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Freedom of Information Act. The Scheduling Conference set for 01/26/2012 at 10:30 AM is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/19/2012.(wjc, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/6/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Evans
Represented By: Kevin D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Marcia Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?