Hill v. Intergraph Government Solutions Corporation
Plaintiff: James P. Hill
Defendant: Intergraph Government Solutions Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv02582
Filed: October 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL APROVING Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice. The Trial Preparation Conference set for November 2, 2012, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence November 26, 2012, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/18/12. (mjgsl, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/15/2012. (sah, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/2/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 11/26/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/19/11. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Intergraph Government Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Hill
Represented By: John R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intergraph Government Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Todd Arthur Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?