Gross v. Clements et al
Plaintiff: Brian M. Gross
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro, S. M. Vicalvi, Tom Clements, John Davis, Ellen Blackmore, Mary Carter, Thomas Fisher, Mary Beth Kalymer, Kerry Baroni, P. Lastrell, Marcia Mortin and Aristedes Zarvares
Case Number: 1:2011cv02656
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION: The Court finds that altering or amending the judgment is not warranted. Mr. Gross's Motions for Reconsideration ( 99 , 101 , 102 , 103 ) are DENIED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/27/13.(msksec, )
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Anthony DeCesaro, Ellen Blackmore, Kerry Baroni, Marcia Mortin, Mary Carter, Mary Beth Kalymer, Steve M. Vicalvi, Thomas Fisher against Brian M. Gross re: 96 Order on Report and Recommendations, by Clerk on 4/18/2013. (klyon, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/10/2012. (mjwcd)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER denying 67 plaintiffs Motion to Deposit. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/23/2012. (klyon, )
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 CDOC Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline and 04/26/2012 Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/18/2012.(wjcsl, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration on Plaintiff's Motion to Compell [sic] Medical, Dental and Mental Health Records, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/10/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as premature 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Compell [sic] Production of Medical, Dental and Mental Health Records, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/07/2012.(wjc, )
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositio ns from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/23/12. (mskcd)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/14/2012. (sah, )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Motion for Injunctive Relief. ORDERED that the "Petition for Temporary Injunction for Medical/Dental Services" 15 is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/8/12.(lyg, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/28/11. (lygsl, )
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Vacating Dismissal. ORDERED that the Order of Dismissal 9 and Judgment 10 are vacated because Plaintiff, Brian M. Gross, paid the initial partial filing fee on 11/9/11. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen this case and return it to the pro se docket. FURTHER ORDERED that the financial division of the Clerk of the Court shall apply the $20.00 payment entered in Case No. 11-cv-02026-LTB on November 9, 2011, to the instant case, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/20/11. (lygsl, )
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Dismissal. The Prisoner Complaint and the action are dismissed withoutprejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot ( 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction), by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/8/11.(lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. M. Vicalvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Blackmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Kalymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Baroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Lastrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Mortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zarvares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?