March 19, 2015 |
Filing
115
AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 114 Order on Unopposed Motion for Corrected Final Judgment under Rule 60(a). By Clerk on 3/19/2015. (alowe)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting 113 Unopposed Motion for Corrected Final Judgment under Rule 60(a). By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/18/2015.(alowe)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
112
MINUTE ORDER The United States Motion for Corrected Final Judgment Under Rule 60(a) ECF No. 111 is STRICKEN from the record with leave to refile for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1., by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/2015.(evana, )
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing
108
ORDER Of Foreclosure and Decree of Sale re: 107 Judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/9/2014. (evana, )
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing
106
ORDER it is ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Mix ECF No. 99 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. The Objection ECF No. 101 is OVERRULED. In accordance therewith, it is FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Summary J udgment Against Nancy D. Berryman ECF No. 85 is DENIED as to tax year 2000. It is GRANTED as to tax year 1997. Thus, judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Berryman in the amount of $395,136.63 as of December 2, 20 13, plus other statutory additions from December 2, 2013, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c)(1) and 26 U.S.C. § 6621, until judgment is paid in full. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that an Order of Foreclosure and Decree of Sale of the Subject Property shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/16/2014.(evana, )
|
February 24, 2014 |
Filing
98
ORDER Denying 90 Defendant Nancy D. Berryman's ("Berryman") Objection to, and Motion to Strike United States' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Against Nancy D. Berryman by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/24/14.(lag)
|
January 8, 2014 |
Filing
97
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 95 Renewed and Extended Objection to, and Request to the Court to Deny United States' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Against Nancy D. Berryman Per Magistrate Judge's Granted Extension of Time Until o r Before January 6th, 2014. The Court accepts the Motion as Defendant Berrymans Response to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Against Nancy D. Berryman. Plaintiff shall timely file a Reply to the Response by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/08/14.(jjhsl, )
|
June 4, 2013 |
Filing
76
Minute ORDER denying 73 Motion to Strike All of Plaintiff's Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(f) Nunc Pro Tunc and Motion to Set for Hearing of Motion to Strike by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/04/13.(jjhsl, )
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
71
MINUTE ORDER denying 69 Motion to Strike All of Plaintiff's Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(f) Nunc Pro Tunc and Motion to Set for Hearing of Motion to Strike by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/21/13.(jjhsl, )
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Berryman's proposed counterclaims are not accepted for filing with the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remove each Counter Claimant and each Counter Defendant from the electronic docket. FURTHER ORDERED that the Response 58 is accepted only as a Response to Plaintiff's Motion 52 and not as an amendment of the pleadings. FURTHER ORDERED that, due to the confusion regarding the Response filed by Defendant Berryman, Plaintiff may, if it so desires, file a Supplemental Reply of no more than five pages on or before 3/8/13, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/22/13. (sgrim)
|
August 8, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER Overruling Objection of United States Magistrate Judge's Minute Order and Order Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/08/12.(jjhsl, )
|
February 10, 2012 |
Filing
35
MINUTE ORDER granting in part 32 Motion for Leave to Permit Nancy Dell Berryman, Pro Se, Representing All Defendants to Appear Telephonically at February 15, 2012 Scheduling Conference. Defendant Berryman, representing herself only, may appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference set for February 15, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. Defendant Berryman and counsel for Plaintiff must first conference together and then call Chambers on a single line by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/10/12.(jjhsl, )
|
December 29, 2011 |
Filing
20
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Defendant Nancy D. Berrymans Take Judicial Notice Petition to Correct & Amend Court Jurisdiction and Venue Fraud Upon the Court by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/29/11.(jjh, )
|
November 18, 2011 |
Filing
9
AMENDED ORDER re: 4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/18/11. (wydcd, rrk)
|