Stransky et al v. HealthONE of Denver, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Stransky and Natalie Fiore
Defendant: HealthONE of Denver, LLC, HCA-HealthOne LLC and Hospital Corporation of America
Case Number: 1:2011cv02888
Filed: November 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting 327 Joint Motion to Revise the Court's Approval Order, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/24/2015.(cthom, )
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MINUTE ENTRY for Fairness Hearing held before Judge William J. Martinez on 10/6/2015: ORDERED: The Joint Motion For Approval Of Settlement Agreement 310 is GRANTED. Restricted 312 IS APPROVED AND GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs have up to and including October 20, 2015 to file itemized invoices of the expert witness expenses which specifically state the source and purpose of each amount requested. The Defendant's unopposed Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs FLSA Collective Action 307 is GRANTED. ORDERED:The transcript of this hearing is restricted at Level 1. Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel. (dhans, )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER the Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement ECF No. 310 is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks a hearing and preliminary approval of the settlement, and the Settlement Agreement is PRELIMINARILY APPROVED. In Court Fairness Hearing is set for 10/6/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 801 before Judge William J. Martinez, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/27/2015.(evana, )
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting 301 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Deadlines and Notice of Settlement in Principle. Case STAYED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2015.(emill)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER ADOPTING 290 RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND DISMISSING CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, APPEAR, AND COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS. The following Opt-In Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f) and/or 41(b) and D.C. COLO.LCivR 41.1: Melanie Armijo, Nancy Betzen, Kathleen Burke, Debra Coaty, Donald Ederer, Cindy Hang, Kristi Lambert, Bernadette Lujan, Tammy Mahoney, Erish Major, Jr., Shawna Redman, Sarah Smith, Phylis Solnick, Lysandra Ybar ra, Jacqueline Zelaya, Jay Abbit, Robert Armijo, Dan Decker, Tricia Duran, Cherry Fiano, Lisa Galbraith, Dixie Garden, Tiffany Greenwald, Sarah Johnson, Joyce Jones, Tina Nelson, Dawn Norlund, Raquel Rodriguez, Loretta Sanders, Ana Schubert, Christopher Sheeder, Jason Sweasy, Ann Marie Uwandu, Calvin West, Alton Williams, and Brenda Young. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/12/2015. (alowe)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference / Motion Hearing / Show Cause Hearing held on 11/13/2014. Order to Show Cause 277 is stayed until further order of the Court. O n or before 11/17/2014, counsel for the Defendant shall file a written Status Report regarding deposition status of Jahnine Nassif and Ashlee Fifer. Denying 271 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order; Granting 273 Defendant's Moti on for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing / Status Conference set for 12/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline for specific depositions 3/31/2015. Deadline to file Motion for Decertification and any Dispositive Motions is extended to 4/30/2015. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference/Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/2014. Granting 237 Defendant's Motion to Clarify the Number of Depositions it May Take Without Leave of Court Or, in the Alternative, D efendant's Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions and Request for Expedited Consideration. Court grants the request for 11 additional depositions, without leave of Court. Defendant may take 15 more depositions. Discovery cut-off ext ended to 9/22/2014. Dispositive Motions deadline extended to 11/21/2014. Plaintiffs are given until 7/22/2014 to provide individuals to be deposed. Plaintiff's Oral Motion to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is granted, up to and including 8/22/2014. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (eseam)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER adopting 227 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing with prejudice listed Opt-In Plaintiffs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/3/14.(dkals, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE ORDER granting 233 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs Motion to Request the Re-Opening of 30(b)(6) Depositions, Doc. No. 218 . Accordingly, Docket No. 218 is withdrawn without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/24/2014.(evana, )
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MINUTE ORDER granting 230 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify scheduling order. Designation of experts due by 6/27/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/20/2014.(trlee, )
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER The Stransky Plaintiffs Motion to Join Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs ECF No. 165 is DENIED; The Stransky Plaintiffs Motion to Reassign Related Cases and/or to Consolidate Related Cases ECF No. 186 is GRANTED; Civil Action No. 11-cv-2888-W JM-MJW and Civil Action No. 14-cv-0042-WJMKMT are CONSOLIDATED; Civil Action No. 11-cv-2888-WJM-MJW shall be the lead case and all future filings shall be made in this action; Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe shall be assigned to both of the consolidated actions, and the cases shall henceforth be numbered as Civil Action No. 11-cv-2888-WJM-MJW and Civil Action No. 14-cv-0042-WJM-MJW; The Brooks Plaintiffs Motion to Reassign Case No. 14-cv-0042, ECF No. 9 is DENIED AS MOOT; Defenda nts Motion to Stay Proceedings No. 14-cv-0042, ECF No. 12 pending the resolution of the joinder and consolidation motions is DENIED AS MOOT; Defendant shall file an answer or responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint in the Brooks Action on or before April 18, 2014; and The Clerk shall docket a copy of this Order in Civil Action No. 14-cv-0042-WJM-MJW, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/3/2014.(evana, )
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER granting 192 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Her Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Defendant's Request to Conduct the Deposition of Opt-In Plaintiff, Starla Kirchner and 193 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Her Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Defendant's Request to Conduct the Deposition of Opt-In Plaintiff, Henrietta Golyansky by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/30/14. Docket Nos. 187 and 188 are deemed withdrawn. (dkals, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting in part 126 Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. The Court ORDERS that a reasonable award of attorneys fees and costs for the work expended by Plaintiffs counsel is $33,265.76, and that Plaintiffs shall recover this amount from Defendants counsel, Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/7/2013.(ervsl, )
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: WHEREFORE, based upon these findings of fact and conclusions of law thiscourt ORDERS: 1. That Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 (docket no. 132 ) is DENIED; and 2. That each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/17/13. (alvsl)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER granting 123 defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Status Conference. Status Conference 3/21/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. Status Conference reset for 8/22/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watana be. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Parties shall file their joint proposed Amended Scheduling Order,based on any opt-in plaintiffs, on or before 8/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/19/2013.(mjwcd)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 121 Defendant's Motion for Clarification and Modification of Court's Order and Request for Extension of Time, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/15/2013.(ervsl, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Injunctive Relief is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Motion for Contempt is DENIED; Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions ECF No. 101 is DENIED as moot; Defendants Motion for Order to Approve Notice to the Conditional Class ECF No. 103 is GRANTED and the Notice attached hereto at Appendix B is approved, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/7/2013. (ervsl, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/27/2013. (wjmcd, )
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 81 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Request to Conduct the F.R.C.P [SIC] 30 (B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Healthone of Denver, Inc., and Order Modifying Rule 16 Sc heduling Order; That the dispositive motion deadline of December 21, 2012, is VACATED; That the Final Pretrial Conference on February 12, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED; That a Status Conference is set before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on March 21, 201 3, at 9:30 a.m. At the Status Conference, the parties shall be prepared to give this court an update on the status of any opt-in plaintiffs and the court will discuss setting another Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for additional discovery for any op-t in plaintiffs. Counsel shall bring their calendars to this Status Conference; and That each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for the subject motion docket no. 81 since this court finds to award expenses under these circumstances would be unjust. Status Conference set for 3/21/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/11/2012.(ervsl, )
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing / Status Conference held on 1/7/2013. Taking under advisement 81 Motion for Protective Order. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery to Conduct the F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Healthtone and the Deposition of Shawn Palmer until 12/31/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/14/2012.(ervsl, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement their Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification, to Wit, Amending their Proposed Judicial Notice to Class ECF No. 49 is DENIED, and this Motion is STRICKEN as an impermissible sur- reply; Defendan ts Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement ECF No. 52 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Request a Hearing on their Pending Motion for Conditional Certification ECF No. 65 is DE NIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint ECF No. 50 is STRICKEN; Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and for Judicial Notice to Class ECF No. 35 is GRANTED IN PART; a conditional collective action is her eby certified consistent with this Order; Defendant shall provide Plaintiffs counsel with the names and last known physical addresses of all individuals in the Conditional Class by December 17, 2012, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/6/2012.(ervsl, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery for the Purpose of Conducting the Deposition of G. Edward Anderson, Ph.D. Scheduling Order 26 is amended to extend the deadline for discovery for the sole purpose of deposing Dr. Anderson. Discovery due by 11/28/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/20/2012.(mjwcd)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 26 is amended. Deadline for disclosure of rebuttal experts up to and including 10/15/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/19/2012.(mjwcd)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Scheduling Order 26 is amended as set forth in the Order. Discovery due by 11/23/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/27/2012.(mjwcd)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CORRECTED ORDER Granting in part 36 Plaintiffs' MOTION Toll the Statute of Limitations, re: 44 Order, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/14/12. (gmssl, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/12/2012. (mjwcd)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Add Additional Plaintiffs, to Correct Named Defendants, to Add Additional Facts Supporting Violations of the Federal Labor Standards Act, and to Amend the Caption to Reflect Same. Amended Complaint (17-1) is entered as of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/24/2012.(mjwcd)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/1/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stransky et al v. HealthONE of Denver, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stransky
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Fiore
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthONE of Denver, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA-HealthOne LLC
Represented By: Lisa A. Hogan
Represented By: Sarah M. Stettner
Represented By: Martine Tariot Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?