Water Supply and Storage Company, The v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Water Supply and Storage Company, The
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, Maribeth Gustafson, Glenn P. Casamassa, United States Department of Interior, Ken Salazar, United States National Park Service and John Wessels
Case Number: 1:2011cv02896
Filed: November 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER SUA SPONTE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/25/2015. (alowe)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Unopposed Motion to be Excused from Participating in Settlement Conference with Full Authority; granting 96 Unopposed Motion to be Excused from Participating in Settlement Conference with Full Authority by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/14/2015.(mdave, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 75 Motion to Amend Joint Case Management Plan by Judge John L. Kane on 07/15/14.(jhawk, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: SIXTH Amended Joint Case Management Plan, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/28/2014. (trlee, )
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Fifth Amended Joint Case Management Plan for Petitions for Review of Agency Action in Environmental Cases (ORDER). WSSC's Opening Brief will be due Tuesday, 1/21/2014. Federal Respondents' Response Brief will be due Wednesday, 4/2/2014. CTU's Response Brief will be due Monday, 4/14/2014. WSSC's Reply Brief will be due Wednesday, 5/14/214. The Federal Respondents may file a Supplemental Brief on or before Wednesday, 5/14/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/11/2013.(klyon, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 THIRD AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR PETITIONS FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION IN ENVIRONMENTAL CASES (ORDER). Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/18/2013. Federal Respondents' Response Brief due 12/20/2013. CTU's Response Brief due 1/10/2014. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 2/10/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/26/13. (mnfsl, )
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting WSSC's Motion for Limited Discovery, Doc. 38 , by Judge John L. Kane on 11/15/12. (sgrim)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 First Amended Joint Case Management Plan for Petitions for Review of Agency Action in Environmental Cases re: 31 . Adm Plaintiff's Brief due by 8/31/2012. Adm Defendant's Brief due by 10/15/2012. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 11/16/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/15/12.(lygsl, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint Case Management Plan for Review of Agency Action (ORDER) Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/12/2012. Adm Defendants Brief due by 8/20/2012. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 9/19/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/2/12. (gmssl, )
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 CTU's Motion to Intervene, subject to limitations, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/26/12.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Water Supply and Storage Company, The v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Supply and Storage Company, The
Represented By: Howard Kenison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maribeth Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn P. Casamassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States National Park Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?