Kahn v. Daniels
Petitioner: Roy Albert Kahn
Respondent: Charles Daniels
Case Number: 1:2011cv02985
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendations. Applicant's 26 Objection is overruled, and the 1 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. The case is dismissed with prejudice by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/20/12.(dkals, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER denying 21 petitioner's Motion to Strike Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus (DE-16), and the Declaration of Mr. Jon M. Adduci in Support (DE, 16-1), by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/15/2012.(mjwcd)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 17 Applicants Motion for Status on Respondents Response to Order to Show Cause. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner/applicant shall have up to and including February 24, 2012, to file a Reply to the Return to Petitioners Writ of Habeas Corpus Docket No. 16 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/1/2012.(ervsl, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. Case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/28/11. (gmssl, )
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/30/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kahn v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy Albert Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?