Occupy Denver et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Occupy Denver, Amberlynn Restorick, Terry Burnsed, Robert Piper, Rob Kuykendall, Catherine Lindsey, Natalie Wyatt and Daniel Garcia
Defendant: Michael Hancock, Gerald R. Whitman and City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2011cv03048
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 28 is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/14/2011. (sah, )
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 2 filed 11/22/2011, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/7/2011.(sah, )
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding custody of hearing exhibits by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/5/11. (rebcd)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ALLOCATING HEARING TIME. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/2/2011. (sah, )
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO FILE WITNESS SUMMARIES. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/2011. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Occupy Denver et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hancock
Represented By: David Van Denberg Cooke
Represented By: Douglas Jay Friednash
Represented By: Karla Jayne Pierce
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Whitman
Represented By: David Van Denberg Cooke
Represented By: Douglas Jay Friednash
Represented By: Karla Jayne Pierce
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Represented By: David Van Denberg Cooke
Represented By: Douglas Jay Friednash
Represented By: Karla Jayne Pierce
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Occupy Denver
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amberlynn Restorick
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Burnsed
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Piper
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Kuykendall
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lindsey
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Wyatt
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Represented By: Tiffany Jo Drahota
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?