November 2, 2015 |
Filing
183
ORDER. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion to Continue Indigency Status for Purposes of Appeal 179 is denied without prejudice because the motion is deficient. ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/02/15.(jhawk, )
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
175
ORDER denying 172 Motion to Amend an Order Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 59(e). Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/14/15.(jhawk, )
|
September 9, 2014 |
Filing
168
Final Judgment. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants and against the plaintiff. ORDERED that defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Clerk on 09/09/14. (jhawk, )
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
153
ORDER denying 104 Motion to Amend a Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/20/14.(mfiel, )
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
138
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 10/29/2013. ORDERED: 115 Motion to Quash in Part and 119 Amended Motion to Quash in Part are GRANTED in part and DENIED in p art. The court will require the CDOC to search medical grievances that identify Defendants Klenke and Montoya as respondents when the nature of the grievance dealt with pain medication. The court will limit the scope of the subpoena to include the ti me period between 1/1/2011 through12/30/2011. Responsive documents consistent with the court's ruling should be produced for in camera review within 3 weeks of today's date. ORDERED: 135 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. The court will treat Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production served on Defendant Colorado Health Partners as withdrawn. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing
121
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 8/15/2013. For the reasons stated on the record, 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of Certificate of Review Requirements is DENIED. Within 7 calendar days from todays date, counsel shall file a supplemental brief that updates the factual basis of the 115 Motion to Quash and notices the court if Defendants would like to substantially narrow, withdraw, or stand on the Motion. Plaintiff shall have 7 days to respond from the date the Motion is received. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
91
ORDER. The 81 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. The 46 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint from Defendant Correctional Health Partners is granted in part and denied in part. The state defendan ts' 52 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The 90 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Objection to the Findings and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge is denied as moot. Plaintiff's s econd and third claims for relief in the third amended complaint against Timothy Creany and Steven Krebs, respectively, are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's fourth claim for relief against Correctional Healthcare Partners in the third ame nded complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Within thirty days of this order, plaintiff shall file a Certificate of Review. The Clerk of the Court shall file plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint [Docket No. 63-1]. Plaintiff's Fourth Ame nded Complaint [Docket No. 63-1] is limited to Eighth Amendment claims against William Klenke and Dolores Montoya based upon allegations that they failed to provide or change plaintiff's medication. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/28/13.(mnfsl, )
|
February 15, 2013 |
Filing
86
ORDER denying 37 Motion to Clarify Prior, Confusing Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/15/13.(dkals, )
|
May 7, 2012 |
Filing
28
ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/07/2012. (skssl, )
|
April 12, 2012 |
Filing
26
ORDER denying 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/12/12.(lswsl, )
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/31/12. (lygsl, )
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing
13
MINUTE ORDER denying as unnecessary 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Subiuite[sic] Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/27/12.(lsw, )
|