Hutchinson v. Houle et al
Plaintiff: |
John Hutchinson |
Defendant: |
Houle, John Davis and Tom Clements |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv03108 |
Filed: |
November 29, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Chaffee |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 4, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER that The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 56 , is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 48 is GRANTED IN PART; and This action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1M., by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/4/2013.(ervsl, )
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting 58 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. The parties shall file a status report with the Court indicating what, if any, changes to the Scheduling Order are needed, within five business days of a ruling on Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2013 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2013. (mehcd)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing
53
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/28/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/2012. (mehcd)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 37 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 34 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant in his official capacity is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/31/2012.(ervsl, )
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
43
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Stay. Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/10/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/09/12. (alvsl)
|
June 25, 2012 |
Filing
33
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/25/2012. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 19 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. ORDERED: Defendant shall file an Answer or other response to the Amended Complaint on or before July 2, 2012.(wjmcd, )
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
8
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw in Part. The Complaint and claims asserted against Defendant Houle shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Defendants John Davis and Tom Clements are dismissed from the action, and the Clerk of the Court is instructed to remove them as named parties to this action. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/27/2012. (sah, )
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/18/12. (lsw, )
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing
3
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/8/11. (lsw, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?