Backcountry Hunters and Anglers v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Backcountry Hunters and Anglers
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Mark Stiles and Thomas Tidwell
Case Number: 1:2011cv03139
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT: Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment 82 is DENIED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/13/14.(msksec, )
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of BlueRibbon Coalition, The, Colorado Off Highway Vehicle Coalition, Dunton Hot Springs, Inc., Dunton, LLC, Public Access Preservation Association, Rico Alpine Society, San Juan Citizens Alliance, San Juan Trail Rid ers, Town of Rico, Colorado, Trails Preservation Alliance, United States Forest Service, Mark Stiles, Thomas Tidwell against Backcountry Hunters and Anglers re: 60 Opinion and Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Respondents are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court. By Clerk on 3/22/13. (kfinn, )
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Opinion and ORDER on Merits denying 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/21/2013. (klyon, )
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ENTRY for Law and Motion Hearing held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/24/2012. 31 ; 33 Motions for Leave are GRANTED. 42 Motion to Strike is DENIED 29 Motion to Supplement is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Other matters addressed and deadlines imposed are set forth in the Minutes. (Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Judicial Consent for Law Student Entry of Appearance for Boe Nicholson, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/12/12. (gmssl, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ( ORDER.Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/11/2012. Adm Defendants Brief due by 5/9/2012. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 5/29/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/5/2012. (sah, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Intervene. Answer is to be entered, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/2/12.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backcountry Hunters and Anglers v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Backcountry Hunters and Anglers
Represented By: Michael Christopher Soules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Jason Alan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stiles
Represented By: Jason Alan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Tidwell
Represented By: Jason Alan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?