Buccini v. Groff et al
Plaintiff: K K Buccini
Defendant: Regina Sanders Groff and Beverly J. Harvard
Case Number: 1:2011cv03154
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Reconsider, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/10/12.(lswsl, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended 8 ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that to the extent Plaintiff Dr. K K Buccini in the document titled Declaration of Techinical [sic] Difficulty 10 seeks an extension of time in order to comply with the order of 1/18/2012 the request is denied. The complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 is denied. Any other pending motions are denied as moot. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/27/12. (lsw, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies and File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/18/12. (lsw, )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buccini v. Groff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Sanders Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly J. Harvard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K K Buccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?