24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. v. Rodriquez-Hoeper
Plaintiff: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Defendant: Megan Rodriquez-Hoeper
Case Number: 1:2011cv03209
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 30 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 1/22/13. (sgrim)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order of Dismissal. Having resolved the matter of sanctions, the above captioned action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/9/13. (sgrim)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Denying 28 Reconsideration of Attorney Fee Award, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/2/12. (sgrim)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER granting 24 Motion for an Order Awarding Entitlement to Reasonable Attorney Fees as Sanctions Against Opposing Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC § 1927 for Multiplying Proceedings Unreasonably and Vexatiously, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/24/12.(lygsl, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/2012. (mjwcd)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositio ns from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/19/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. v. Rodriquez-Hoeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Rodriquez-Hoeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?