Moody v. Capital Management Services, LP
Plaintiff: Steve A. Moody
Defendant: Capital Management Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2011cv03212
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/6/12. (msksec, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone for Initial Scheduling/Planning Conference Set for 04/04/2012. Plaintiff's counsel may appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference on 04/04/2012 at 10:30 AM by dialing the Court, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/30/2012.(wjc, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/19/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. Capital Management Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve A. Moody
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Management Services, LP
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?