Serna v. 3N, Inc.
Plaintiff: Regina Serna
Defendant: 3N, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv03388
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER of DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal [# 52 ] is APPROVED. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 6/28/2013, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 7/15/2013, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/20/2013. (klyon, )
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/7/2013. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions 34 is DENIED. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 7/15/2013 08:30 AM in Suite 1000 (Colorado Springs) before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/4/12. (rebsec, )
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/10/2012. (kmtcd)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/18/2012. (kmtcd)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/10/2012. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serna v. 3N, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3N, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?