Harrison v. Larimer County, Board of County Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Jay Harrison
Defendant: Justin (I) Smith, Justin Smith, William (I) Nelson, William Nelson, Larimer County, Board of County Commissioners and Larimer County, Colorado Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2011cv03407
Filed: December 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 50 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations, and Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Clerk on 3/12/2013. (klyon, )
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Defendants' Opposed Second Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Time to Designate Defendants' Expert Witnesses and to Extend the Expert Discovery Cutoff. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/1/12. (klyon, )
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/28/12. (msksec, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/17/12. (mskcd)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/10/2012. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Larimer County, Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin (I) Smith
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William (I) Nelson
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Nelson
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County, Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County, Colorado Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Jeannine Sue Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Harrison
Represented By: David Michael Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?