Rapid Funding, LLC v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: |
Rapid Funding, LLC |
Defendant: |
James River Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00036 |
Filed: |
January 6, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
105
ORDER OF DISMISSAL; granting 104 Joint Motion To Dismiss with Prejudice; any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/19/13. (kfinn, )
|
December 27, 2012 |
Filing
94
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/27/2012. The court WITHDRAWS 75 Motion to Strike. The parties shall put together a conference call to Magistrate Judge Shaffer& #039;s chambers (303.844.2117) on January 4, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. The purpose of this conference call shall be to provide the court with an oral status report. If after this conference call the court feels there is a realistic chance to settle this case, Magistrate Judge Shaffer will meet and confer with Judge Blackburn regarding setting a Settlement Conference. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
72
MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Defendant's Motion For Leave To File Corrected Reply in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/27/12. (kfinn, )
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
60
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Based on Res Judicata, Statute of Limitations, and Twombly 12 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/28/12.(kfinn, )
|
August 16, 2012 |
Filing
47
MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 38 Motion to Vacate and granting 46 Motion to Withdraw Document. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/16/12.(mjgsl, )
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing
32
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/11/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 1/28/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/2/12. (rebsec, )
|
February 23, 2012 |
Filing
16
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2012. For reasons as stated on the record, the court GRANTS in PART and DENIES in PART 13 Motion to Stay. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 2/17/2012 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/19/12. (cbssec)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?