Archangel Diamond Corporation Liquidating Trust v. OAO Lukoil
Plaintiff: Archangel Diamond Corporation Liquidating Trust
Defendant: OAO Lukoil
Case Number: 1:2012cv00041
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss as indicated in the attached order, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/18/2014.(tscha, )
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ENTRY for Oral Argument Hearing held on 11/19/2013 before Judge Raymond P. Moore, taking under advisement 29 Motion to Dismiss. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Status Conference. Status Conference 7/6/2012 2:00 PM is vacated. Status Report due by 8/1/2012, and the first day of each month thereafter until Judge Brimmer rules on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 29 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/5/2012.(mjwcd)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Disclose Whether It is "Subject to Jurisdiction in Any States Court of General Jurisdiction" Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(k)(2). Denying 41 Plaintiff's Motio n for Leave to Take Personal Jurisdictional Discovery Regarding DS Engineering, Inc. and Expedited Briefing. Denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Personal Jurisdictional Discovery. Discovery is STAYED pending ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 29 . Each party pay their own attorney fees and costs for these motions. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/10/2012.(mjwcd)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER denying 18 Motion for Sanctions; granting 20 Motion to Vacate. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/12, at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. Status Conference set for 4/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/6/2012.(jjpsl, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER re: 4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/24/12. [amended to correct spelling] (pabcd)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/23/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archangel Diamond Corporation Liquidating Trust v. OAO Lukoil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAO Lukoil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archangel Diamond Corporation Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Bruce Samuel Marks
Represented By: Chad Michael McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?