December 12, 2014 |
Filing
222
ORDER granting 221 the parties Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Action With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2)(A)(ii), with each party to bear its own respective attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/12/2014.(evana, )
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing
214
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 162 Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Companys Amended Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporations Second Amended Complaint, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/25/2014.(evana, )
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
213
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for December 11,2014 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Amended Motion to Compel Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporati on to Properly Respond to Hartford's Written Discovery [#166] and Plaintiff's oral Motion for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, see Minute Order [#184] at 1, are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file dismissal papers on or before November 15, 2014. (lgale)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing
206
ORDER denying 147 Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Companys Rule12(b) (6) Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporations Second Amended Complaint, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/2/2014.(evana, )
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
204
MINUTE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion 202 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for July 22, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed pretrial order shall be submitted on or before October 2, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion 199 is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/30/2014.(evana, )
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing
197
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/28/14. Stipulated Motion for Leave to Reschedule Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff for July 2, 2014 195 is GRANTED. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) deposition of Plaintiff may be taken on or before July 2, 2014, outside of the Discovery Deadline. (lgale)
|
April 29, 2014 |
Filing
183
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/29/14 Granting 181 Stipulated Motion for Leave to Conduct Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff on May 30, 2014(lgale)
|
March 15, 2014 |
Filing
172
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/14. (lag)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
168
MINUTE ORDER Denying as Moot 165 Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Compel Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporation to Properly Respond to Hartford's Written Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/10/14.(lag)
|
March 3, 2014 |
Filing
164
MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 115 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporations Amended Complaint, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/2014.(evana, )
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing
157
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/21/14.(lag)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
146
MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Extension Motion 142 and the Motion to Amend 144 are GRANTED. ORDERED that the Scheduling Order entered on May 3, 2012 19 , and amended on October 31, 2013 [#60], is further modified to extend the Discovery Dead line to February 28, 2014. Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants First Set of Written Discovery is extended to January 27, 2014. ORDERED that Mr. Rodewald's deposition may be taken on March 12, 2014, outside of the Discovery Deadline by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/09/14.(jjhsl, )
|
December 18, 2013 |
Filing
136
ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/18/13.(lag)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
131
ORDER. ORDERED that the Stipulation to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint Without Prejudice 123 is APPROVED. The Third-Party Complaint against Canal Insurance Company is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and fees by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/04/13. (jjhsl, )
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
130
MINUTE ORDER granting 128 Motion to Withdraw Steven R. Kabler as Counsel for Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporation. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/31/13.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 10/31/2013 to add a word (jjhsl, ).
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing
117
ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion [#103] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. To the extent the Motion seeks a stay, it is DENIED. To the extent the Motion seeks extension of the deadline to respond to the Motion to Amend [#95], it is GRANTED. ORDERED that Defendants deadline to file a response to the Motion to Amend [#95] is extended to September 30, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/19/13.(jjhsl, )
|
September 9, 2013 |
Filing
113
ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave to File Its Motion [for] Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporations Amended Complaint. Hartford may file the motion for summary judgment attached to its motion for leave (ECF No. 100-1). Bituminous' response shall be filed within 21 days of the filing of the summary judgment motion. The reply shall be filed within 14 days of the date of service of the response by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/09/13.(jjhsl, )
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
110
MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that a Telephonic Discovery Hearing is scheduled for September 9, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall first conference together and then call Chambers before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/04/13. (jjhsl, )
|
March 12, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER. ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant Canal Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) 57 is DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/12/13.(jjhsl, )
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
77
ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Corporation's Amended Complaint 38 , which was converted to a motion for summary judgment, is GR ANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to the fifth claim for damages resulting from wrong of another, and DENIED as to the third and fourth claims for intentional interference with contractual relations and civil conspiracy, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/6/13.(sgrim)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
69
ORDER; 58 Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures Pending Determination of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Third Party Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that all disclosure and discovery are STAYED pending resolution of the Motions t o Dismiss [38, 57]. 67 Unopposed Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order is GRANTED and that the deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order 19 are VACATED. A new Scheduling Conference will be set upon resolutio of the Motions to Dismiss [38. 57], by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/15/2012.(klmcd, )
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
64
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/05/12.(jjhsl, )
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Plaintiff Bituminous Casualty Company's Amended Complaint filed August 23, 2012 (ECF No. 38) is converted to a motion for summary judgment. ORDERED that Defendant may attach to its reply brief any material outside the pleadings that it wants the Court to consider in connection with its motion for summary judgment by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/09/12. (jjhsl, )
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
29
MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion 23 is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter the Amended Complaint and Jury Demand located at Docket No. 23-2. ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File its Third-Party Complaint Against Canal Insurance Company 26 is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter Defendant's Third-Party Complaint Against Canal Insurance Company located at Docket No. 26-1 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/31/12.(jjhsl, )
|