Johnson v. Suthers et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wayne Johnson
Defendant: Karen (I) Beye, Mary Ann Hicks, Bill Louis, Bill (I) Louis, Richard Bengtsson, Richard (I) Bengtsson, Toni Herman, Laura Davidson, Claudia Smith- Swain, Jonica Brunner, Melissa Balquin, Policy Studies, Inc., Jeff Ball, Young Williams, P.C., El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Mardi Houston, John (I) Suthers, John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, Bill Ritter, Bill (I) Ritter, Reggie Bicha, Reggie (I) Bicha, Karen Beye and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00096
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 103 Motion. The plaintiff's Motion for Permission ToOpenly Approach the Courts Domain [# 103 ] is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/13/2013.(klyon, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 101 Motion to Reconsider. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/2013.(klyon, )
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER denying 94 Motion to Remand. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/13/13. (kfinn, )
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying as moot 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 42 Motion for Joinder; granting 66 Report and Recommendations; denying as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The objections stated in the plaintiff's Objec tion To Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe (ECF No. 66 ) 80 filed 10 June 5, 2012, are OVERRULED. This case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Judgment SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants. Defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the clerk of the court in the time and manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/3/12.(mjgsl, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 71 Motion for Sanctions Against Counsel for PSI Defendants; and denying 76 Motion to Disqualify United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe and Strike Recommendation. With the consent of the magistrate judge, my general order of reference in this case 3 filed January 18, 2012, is WITHDRAWN as to the plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Counsel for PSI Defendants. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/2/12.(mjgsl, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 47 Defendants Balquin's and Brunner's Motion for Leave to File Supplement to 34 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim Against Them, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/23/12.(mjgsl, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Defendants Policy Studies Inc's, Melissa Balquin's And Jonica Brunner's Unopposed Motion to Stay Pretrial Activity Pending Resolution Of The Motion To Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/12.(mjgsl, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. A Scheduling/ Planning Conference is set for 5/14/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/27/2012. (sah, )
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Defendant Policy Studies Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Additional Security at Court Proceedings. A court security officer shall attend the status conference scheduled for 02/27/2012 at 9:30 AM, and all future Court proceedings in this action, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/24/2012.(wjc, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Status Conference for Pro Se Plaintiff set for 2/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/23/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Suthers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen (I) Beye
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Hicks
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Louis
Represented By: George Nels Monsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill (I) Louis
Represented By: George Nels Monsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bengtsson
Represented By: George Nels Monsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard (I) Bengtsson
Represented By: George Nels Monsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Herman
Represented By: George Nels Monsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Smith- Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonica Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Balquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policy Studies, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Michele Kramer
Represented By: Lino S. Lipinsky de Orlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Ball
Represented By: Matt Raymond Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Williams, P.C.
Represented By: Matt Raymond Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: George Nels Monsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardi Houston
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Suthers
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hickenlooper
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Hickenlooper
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Ritter
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill (I) Ritter
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Bicha
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie (I) Bicha
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Beye
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Represented By: Andrew Mutabaazi Katarikawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?