Adams v. EMC Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Vashone L. Adams
Defendant: Nigel D. Brazier, EMC Mortgage Corporation, Acqura Loan Servicing, Nigel (I) D. Brazier, JP Morgan Chase & Company, James (I) Dimon, James Dimon, Carol Young and Carol (I) Young
Case Number: 1:2012cv00344
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL re: 57 Notice of Appeal filed by Vashon Adams, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/19/13. (lswsl )
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Acqura Loan Servicing, EMC Mortgage Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Carol Young, Carol (I) Young, James Dimon, James (I) Dimon, William Berong, William (I) Berong against Vashone L. Adams re: 55 Order on Motion to Dismiss. this case and all concomitant claims for relief are DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Clerk on 3/20/13. (kfinn, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OVERRULING 46 52 53 OBJECTIONS TO AND ADOPTING 45 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; This case and all concomitant claims for relief are DISMISSED; The Motion To Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Acquara Loa n Services, Llc and William Berrong and Supporting Brief 37 is GRANTED; Chase Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint And Jury Demand Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) 38 is GRANTED; Judgment SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants against the plaintiff on all claims for relief and causes of action asserted in this action; Defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the clerk of the court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER denying 49 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/4/2012.(kfinn, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER striking 36 Third Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/12.(mjgsl, )
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/19/2012; DENIED AS MOOT 28 Motion to Dismiss; DENIED AS MOOT 30 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 33 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; Defendants shall respond to the Third Amended Complaint on or before 7/2/2012. The Scheduling Conference set for today is VACATED and will be reset in the future, if appropriate. No discovery is permitted at this time, absent further order of the Court. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/29/12.(mjgsl, )
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/14/12. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. EMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigel D. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acqura Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigel (I) D. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Dimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol (I) Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vashone L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?