August 10, 2015 |
Filing
118
ORDER OF DISMISSAL This action is dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/10/15. (ktera)
|
August 7, 2015 |
Filing
116
MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to the Minute Order entered by U. S. Magistrate Judge Hegarty on June 16, 2015, advising that counsel have agreed to settle this case 108 , the August 10, 2015, trial date is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/7/15. (ktera)
|
July 23, 2015 |
Filing
115
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to the 114 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss All Individual Defendants with Prejudice, Defendants Commander Greg Broswell, Commander Kenneth Leach, Commander Paul Glanz, Commander Sally Gomez and Commander Jeramy Hettinger are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, including attorney fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/23/15. (ktera)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
100
ORDER Jury Trial set for 8/10/2015 at 8:30 a.m., Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/8/15. (ktera)
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing
96
ORDER Pretrial Conference is set for May 8, 2015, at 3:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 30, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/25/15. (ktera)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
95
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is denied as to the Commander Defendants and the Sheriff in his official capacity and granted with respect to Sheriff Cooke in his individual capacity. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/24/2015. (ktera)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
94
COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/12/2015. Taking under advisement 92 Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56. FTR: K. Terasaki. (ebuch)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing
91
ORDER Granting 88 Motion for Leave to Amend 81 Motion for Summary Judgment: Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment attached thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/2014.(jsmit)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
75
ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Amend re 56 : Affirmative Expert Disclosure: May 16, 2014, Contradicting Expert Disclosure: June 16, 2014, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: July 14, 2014, Discovery due by 8/14/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2014. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/8/2014.(jsmit)
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
73
ORDER Denying 71 Motion for Protective Order as to defendants other than Paul Glanz, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/15/2014.(jsmit )
|
December 31, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER granting 66 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; Affirmative Expert Disclosure February 13, 2014; Contradicting Expert Disclosure March 13, 2014; Rebuttal Opinion Deadline: April 14, 2014; Discovery cut-off: May 16, 2014; Dispositive Motions Deadline: June 13, 2014; Discovery due by 5/16/2014; Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/31/2013.(ervsl, )
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Modify 56 Scheduling Order: Affirmative Expert Disclosure: December 30, 2013, Contradicting Expert Disclosure: January 31, 2014, Rebuttal Opinion Deadline: February 28, 2014. Discovery due by 3/31/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/18/2013.(rpmcd)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting 62 Motion : Defendants may depose Plaintiff with respect to this matter, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/8/2013.(rpmcd)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing
55
Minute ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference for 7/16/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed scheduling ordermust be submitted in paper form directly to chambers on or before July 11, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. re 53 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/19/2013.(rpmcd )
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16, it is ORDERED that a scheduling conference will be held on July 9, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Str eet, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 3, 2013. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/21/2013. (ervsl, )
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
48
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT THE ESTATE OF DEPUTY JAMES HAYWARD re 47 : all claims against Defendant the Estate of Deputy James Hayward are hereby dismissed, with each party to pay their own respective fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/3/2013.(rpmcd)
|
February 15, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint: the Amended Complaint [29-1] tendered therewith is ordered filed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/15/2013.(rpmcd)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
28
PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/19/12. (rpmcd)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
25
Minute ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Vacate and Reset 24 Scheduling Conference to 11/13/2012 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed scheduling order must be submitted in paper form directly to chambers on or before November 8, 2012, at 4:00 p.m., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/25/2012.(rpmcd)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/31/2012 at 02:30 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 25, 2012, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives permitted by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/28/2012. (rpmcd )
|
September 13, 2012 |
Filing
21
Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 9/13/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 10 , is moot. Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 11 , is denied. Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery 12 , is denied. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
|