International Academy of Business and Financial Management, Limited et al v. Mentz et al

Plaintiff: International Academy of Business and Financial Management, Limited, Brett King and Geoffrey Baring
Defendant: George S Mentz and American Academy of Financial Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00463
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/5/14. The Final Trial Preparation Conference, Jury Selection, and Jury Trial are vacated. (dkals, )
January 9, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/9/2013.(ervsl, )
July 17, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Amended Counterclaims by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/17/13.(dkals, )
January 18, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/18/13.(dkals, )
March 14, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/14/12. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Academy of Business and Financial Management, Limited et al v. Mentz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Academy of Business and Financial Management, Limited
Represented By: Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett King
Represented By: Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Baring
Represented By: Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S Mentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Academy of Financial Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?