Anderson v. Astor Weiss Kaplan & Mandel, LLP et al
Plaintiff: John Paul Anderson
Defendant: Astor Weiss Kaplan & Mandel, LLP, Tatum, LLC, Christopher P. Flannery, Daniel J. Rink, Krassenstein & Unger, LLC and Steven L. Granoff
Case Number: 1:2012cv00488
Filed: February 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 110 Order. By Clerk on 07/21/2014. (athom, )
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 FINAL ORDER Granting Approval of Class Action Settlements, Awards of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, Class Representatives' Incentive Awards and Dismissal With Prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/18/2014. (athom, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Request to Vacate April 12, 2013 Hearing (re: 88 Notice of Settlement filed by John Paul Anderson). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that because the Parties have reached settlements in principle, and because the Plaintiff and Rink bel ieve in good faith that a settlement on all terms will be reached within two weeks, the hearing scheduled for Friday, April 12, 2013, at 8:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. The Motions to Dismiss based on lack of personal jurisdiction shall be held in abeyance pending finalization of the settlement documents. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/11/13. (alvsl)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Motion to Consolidate. ORDERED that Interested Party John Paul Anderson's Motion to Consolidate 17 (11-cv-2971-WYD-KMT, doc #42) is denied without prejudice. ORDERED that the clerk shall docket a copy of this Order in Civil Action No. 1:12-cv-00488-RBJ, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/16/12.(sgrim) Modified on 7/17/2012 to create document link (sgrim).
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a two-week jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 3, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for May 13, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/12/2012. (rbjsec. )
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/28/2012. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Astor Weiss Kaplan & Mandel, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Anderson
Represented By: Peter John Korneffel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astor Weiss Kaplan & Mandel, LLP
Represented By: Carolyn J. Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher P. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Rink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krassenstein & Unger, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Haynes
Represented By: Kelley Allison Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Granoff
Represented By: Kelley Allison Duke
Represented By: Alan S. Fellheimer
Represented By: Mark E. Haynes
Represented By: John Joseph Jacko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?