Todd v. Fidelity National Financial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dale Todd
Defendant: Fidelity National Financial, Inc., FTNG Holdings, Inc., FTNS Holdings, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Alamo Title Insurance, Chicago Title and Trust Company, Commwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Commonwealth Lawyers Title Agency Holding, LLC, Lawyers Title Company, LLC, Security Title Guaranty Co., Ticor Title Company, Servicelink, Inc., First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, Censtar Title Insurance Company, All Real Estate Solutions, LLC., Accurate Title Group, LLC, Continental Reo Services, Inc., Performance Title, Inc., Singlesource Property Solutions, LLC and Telsi Real Estate Solutions, LLC
Interested_party: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00666
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of defendants against plaintiffs re: 231 Order of Dismissal. By Clerk on 3/31/15. (kfinn)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER: The matter is before the court sua sponte in reaction to the notice from counsel that the parties have reached a settlement of the claim of the plaintiff for retaliation. The trial set to commence Monday, 3/23/2015 is vacated and con tinued pending further order. Any pending motion, including the motion of the plaintiff to take judicial notice [# 219 ] is denied without prejudice. The parties shall file their settlement papers by no later than 3/30/2015. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/20/2015. (alowe)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 191 Motion Under Rule 37(c)(1) to Exclude from Trial Plaintiff's Late-Produced Documents. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c)(1), the documents disclosed by the plaintiff, Dale Todd, in his fifth supplemental disclosures, dated 2/27/2015, are excluded from evidence. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/2015. (alowe)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER granting 182 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Erin Toll. The proposed substituted motion [#182-1] attached to the motion to substitute [# 182 ] is accepted for filing along with its attached exhibits [#182-2 through #182-4]. The court notes that a response [# 194 ] and a reply [# 204 ] addressing the substituted motion have been filed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/2015.(alowe)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER denying 163 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/13/2015. (alowe)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 173 Motion to Modify Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/28/2015.(alowe)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2015. Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conferences are set 3/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set 3/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/27/14. (rebsec)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ADOPTING 141 RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants' 121 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 9(b) is GRANTED as to the first, second, and third claims for relief alleged in the complaint, and those claims are DISMISSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/16/2014. (alowe)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER denying 139 Relator Todd's Motion For Leave to FileSupplemental Authority (United States FCA Position in United States ex rel.Adams v. Aurora Loan Servs., Inc.). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/13/2014.(klyon, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Costs and denying 84 Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/2014.(klyon, )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2014. ORDERED: 134 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 108 Relator Dale Todds Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The tendered Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 109 ) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respon d to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 10/8/2013. Fidelity Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 49 ) is denied without prejudice as moot in light of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/17/2013.(klyon, )
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 7/31/2013; Ordered that 62 Plaintiff's Partially Stipulated Motion for Protective Order is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED th at 85 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. A Motion Hearing regarding 49 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is set for 8/15/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of Dismissal as to Certain Defendants. Plaintiff Dale Todd's Notice of Dismissal as To Certain Defendants [# 70 ] is APPROVED. Claims against the following defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the defendants are dropped as named parties to this action: Alamo Title Insurance, Castle Stawiarksi, LLC, Chicago Title and Trust Co., Colorado American Title, LLC, Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Commonwealth Lawyers Title Agency Holding, LLC, CS Legal Services, Fidelity N ational Title Group, Inc., First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, FNTG Holdings, Inc., FNTS Holdings, Inc., Lawyers Title Company, LLC, Next Organization, LLC, PowerLink General Partner, LLC, PowerLink Settlement Services, LP, Security Title Guaranty Co., SingleSource Property Solutions, LLC, Ticor Title Company, and Vision Global Solutions, LLC. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/2013. (klyon, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant CMS Holdings, LLC, only. Plaintiff Dale Todd's Notice of Dismissal as to CMS Holdings, LLC [# 60 ] is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, CMS Holdings, LLC, are DISMISSEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant, CMS Holdings, LLC, is DROPPED as named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/18/2013. (klyon, )
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant, Censtar Title Insurance Company, Only. Plaintiff Dale Todd's Notice of Dismissal as to Censtar Title Insurance Company [# 53 ] is APPROVED. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Censtar Title Insurance Company, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant, Censtar Title Insurance Company, is DROPPED as named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/13/2013. (klyon, )
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendants Freeport Financial Partners, LLC and Stark Investments, LP, Only. Plaintiff Dale Todd's Notice of Dismissal as to Freeport Financial Partners, LLC, and Stark Investments, LP [# 30 ] is APPROVED. Plaintiffs� 39; claims against defendants, Freeport Financial Partners, LLC, and Stark Investments, LP, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants, Freeport Financial Partners, LLC, and Stark Investments, LP, are DROPPED as named parties to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/2/2013. (klyon, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2013 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order seven days prior to the conference. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Fidelity National Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Todd
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Ty Cheung Gee
Represented By: Harold Alan Haddon
Represented By: Norman R. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTNG Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTNS Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamo Title Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Lawyers Title Agency Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Title Guaranty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticor Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicelink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Censtar Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Real Estate Solutions, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accurate Title Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Reo Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Title, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singlesource Property Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telsi Real Estate Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: USA
Represented By: Jamie L. Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?