Duran v. Davis et al
Petitioner: Ronald Duran
Respondent: John Davis and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00877
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 9 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and dismissing this case with prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/12. (dkals, )
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to Dismiss in Part: Claims 1, 4, and a portion of 3 are dismissed. Respondents are to file an answer within 30 days, and Applicant may file a reply within 30 days of the answer. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/24/12. (dkals, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/19/12. (nmmsl, )
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER To File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/01/2012. (nmmsl, )
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Pleading by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/2012. (skssl, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/13/12. (nmmsl, ) Modified on 4/13/2012: this was entered in the wrong case, and was re-entered in correct case. (nmmsl, ).
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/05/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Davis
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?