Morgan et al v. Clements et al
Plaintiff: John Morgan, Dustin Cook, Paul Stark and Jerrod Thoele
Defendant: Tom Clements, Jeffrey Wells, Jim Keller, Liesl Schumacher, John Orey, James J. Fitzpatrick, John (I) Orey, James (I) L. Fitzpatrick, Jeffrey (I) Wells, Jim (I) Keller and Liesl (I) Schumacher
Case Number: 1:2012cv00936
Filed: April 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 19 , 61 and 63 Motions as outlined in the attached order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/30/2014.(trlee, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference held on 5/28/2013, taking under advisement 61 Motion for Summary Judgment and 63 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying without prejudice 90 Motion for Reconsideration, granting 94 Motion to Vacate, and granting 103 Motion for Reconsideration. Court Reporter: Tamara Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 CDOC Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 65 Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Remove Certain 'Undisputed' Facts. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/14/2013. (klyon, )
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 62 Defendant Wells' Motion to Stay Discovery, granting 64 Defendants Tom Clements, Jim Keller, Liesl Schumacher and John Orey's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, and granting 69 Defen dants' Motion for Protective Order Related to Noticed Depositions of Dobbs, Herndon and Messamore. Discovery is STAYED as to all parties until further order of the court. The parties shall file a status report with this court within 10 business days of the District Court's ruling on the outstanding motions for summary judgment, specifically addressing the need for further scheduling and discovery. It is also RECOMMENDED that the trial date of 7/15/2013 be VACATED, subject to rescheduling after ruling on the motions for summary judgment. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/2013. (klyon, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting 80 Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Clarification of Briefing Schedule and For Leave To File 20 Page Reply Briefs in Support of Their Motions To Dismiss. The replies shall be due on or before February 15, 2013, and may be up to 20 pages in length. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/5/13. (kfinn, )
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Plaintiffs' Motion For Order To Convert Motions To Dismiss To Motions For Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. the motions to dismiss [#61 & #63] which were referred to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya are unreferred and the referral is withdrawn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/4/13. (kfinn, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/8/2013. (kmtcd)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF JAMES FITZPATRICK, ONLY. Order granting 34 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Party James J. Fitzpatrick and Amend Caption. James (I) L. Fitzpatrick terminated and Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED. Defendant is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/24/12.(mjgsl, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 7/15/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/7/12. (rebsec, )
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Stay Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/31/12.(mjgsl, )
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/6/2012. (kmtcd)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and taking under advisement in part 12 CDOC Defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate July 12, 2012 Scheduling Conference and Related Proposed Scheduling Order Filing Deadline. The Scheduling C onference set for July 12, 2012, and all deadlines related thereto are VACATED. The Scheduling Conference will be reset by separate order. Plaintiffs may respond to the CDOC Defendants' Motion to the extent that it seeks to stay discovery no later than July 18, 2012. The CDOC Defendants may file a reply in support of their motion to stay no later than July 25, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/12.(mjgsl, )
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/19/2012. (kmtcd)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/11/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan et al v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morgan
Represented By: Siddhartha Hardas Rathod
Represented By: Qusair Mohamedbhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Cook
Represented By: Siddhartha Hardas Rathod
Represented By: Qusair Mohamedbhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Stark
Represented By: Qusair Mohamedbhai
Represented By: Siddhartha Hardas Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrod Thoele
Represented By: Qusair Mohamedbhai
Represented By: Siddhartha Hardas Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liesl Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Orey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Orey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) L. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey (I) Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim (I) Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liesl (I) Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?