Davis v. Kellar et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Davis
Defendant: Mark Kellar, Mark (I) Kellar, Lisa McDermott, Lisa (I) McDermott, Peter Bludworth, Peter (I) Bludworth, David Allred, David (I) Allred, George Santini, George (I) Santini, Cari Ritter, Cari (I) Ritter, A. Vinyard, A. (I) Vinyard, Mike Goodin, Mike (I) Goodin, Gilberta Trujillo, Gilberta (I) Trujillo, S. Hendricks and S. (I) Hendricks
Case Number: 1:2012cv01060
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER granting 137 Second Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; granting 138 Motion to Supplement the Second Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/11/2015.(slibi, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabedenying 122 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 4/13/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 502. (mdave )
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER granting 121 Plaintiff's Corrected Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The Amended Scheduling Order (121-1) shall supercede the Scheduling Order 31 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/6/2015. (emill)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER : Deadline for Defendant USA to file response to Plaintiff's Corrected Motion to Modify Scheduling order 121 3/27/2015. Denying as moot 119 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/2015. (emill)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER granting 111 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The tendered Second Amended Complaint (111-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/3/2014.(emill) Modified on 11/3/2014 to correct typo (emill, ).
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Recommendation 107 is ADOPTED, and the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 91 is DENIED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/25/14.(msksec, )
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Motion to Amend Complaint Pursuant to Bivens. The tendered Amended Complaint (Docket No. 79-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order, and the caption of this case is amended. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/13.(mnfsl, )
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Opinion and ORDER Overruling Objections and Adopting Recommendation. The Court OVERRULES the Plaintiff's Objections (# 57 ) and ADOPTS the Recommendation (# 55 ). The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (# 24 ) is GRANTED. However, the Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint. If he fails todo so within 30 days of the date of this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall close the case. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/10/2013.(klyon, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 59 Motion for Extension of Time and Move for Leave to Amend His Pleading to State a FTCA Claim Under 28 U.S.C. § 1346(b)(1) §§2671 et seq. and 60 Motion for Appointment of Counsel andExtend time to File Certificate of Review Pursuant to Colo.Rev.Stat. 13-20-602 28 U.S.C. §1346(b)(1) §§2671 et seq.. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/21/2013. (klyon, )
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER: Motion to Vacate Deadlines Set in Scheduling Order (Docket No. 49 ) is granted to the extent that all deadlines set in the SchedulingOrder (Docket No. 31 ) are stayed pending a ruling by Chief Judge Krieger on the report and recommendation (Docket No. 55 ). The plaintiff's Motion for Status (Docket No. 53 ) is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/7/2013. (klyon, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RECOMMENDATION that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Docket No. 24 ) be granted. It is, however, recommended that the plaintiff be given an opportunity to move for leave to amend his pleading to state a FTCA claim. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/5/2013. (klyon, )
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Motion to Vacate Deadlines Set in Scheduling Order. Motion is granted to the extent that all of the deadlines set in the Scheduling Order are extended by 60 days to allow time for the court to rule on the pending motion to dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/22/2013.(klyon, )
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 34 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery in this matter is stayed pending a resolution of the pending 24 motion to dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/9/12.(mnfsl, )
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/18/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF(S). Status Conference set for 9/18/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/3/12. (mjgsl, )
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/11/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Kellar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark (I) Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa (I) McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bludworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter (I) Bludworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George (I) Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cari Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cari (I) Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Vinyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. (I) Vinyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike (I) Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberta Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberta (I) Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. (I) Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?