Lips, et al., v. Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County, et al.,
Plaintiff: Virgilius Lips and Lynda Lips
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County, Matt Hanagan, Grayson Robinson, Matt (I) Hanagan, Craig Tangeman and Craig (I) Tangeman
Case Number: 1:2012cv01103
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. The 120 Notice of Settlement and Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Civil Action No. 12-cv-01101-WJD-MJW [sic] With Prejudice is granted. Civil Action No. 12-cv-01103-WYD-MJW, involving claims by Plaintiff Virgilius and Lynda Lips, is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and fees. The case is thus no longer consolidated with 12-cv-01107-WYD- MJW, and shall be taken off the caption. All future filings shall be made in 12-cv-01107-WYD-MJW. Defendants Anders on, Madrigal, Croushore and Pollack's 104 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Lynda and Virgilius Lips is denied as moot. The 102 Stipulated Motion to Withdraw ConfidentialExhibits filed on June 3, 2013 is granted. Exhibits E and F to Plai ntiffs Motion for Reconsideration (ECF Nos. 99-5 and 99-6) shall be withdrawn and replaced with Exhibits E and F that are attached to the motion. Finally, it is ordered that 61 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated First Amen ded Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) is denied without prejudice. The motion is partially moot as it seeks dismissal of claims in both cases and incorporates by reference portions of Arapahoe Defendants' Motion to Dismiss which has b een denied as moot. Defendants may if they wish file a new motion to dismiss in Case No. 12-cv-01107-WYD-MJW that takes into account the currentstatus of the case and tailors the motion to the remaining claims. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/13.(mnfsl, )
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Defendants Board ofCounty Commissioners of Arapahoe County and Arapahoe County Sheriff GraysonRobinson is APPROVED. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Board of CountyCommissioners of Arapahoe County and Arapahoe County Sheriff Grayson Robinsonare DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or her or its own costs andfees. ORDERED that Defendants Arapahoe County Board of CountyCommissioners of Arapahoe County and Sheriff Gra yson Robinson's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint 49 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Defendants Arapahoe County Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County and Sheriff Grayson Robinson's Motion to Comp elthe Deposition Testimony of Plaintiff Julien Lips 75 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Arapahoe County Board of County Commissioners ofArapahoe County and Sheriff Grayson Robinson's Motion for Summary Judgment 110 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Virgilius and Lynda Lips' Fed. R. Civ. P.72(a) Objection to Order Denying Leave to File Supplemental Complaint 107 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that the caption of this action shall be amended to omit the Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County and Arapahoe County Sheriff Grayson Robinson as party defendants by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/02/13.(jjhsl, )
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 99 Plainntiffs Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Leave to File Consolidated Supplemental Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/6/2013.(mjwcd)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 76 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/29/2013.(mjwcd)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER granting 85 Plaintiffs' and Douglas County Defendants' Stipulated Motion for Order to Participate in Early Neutral Evaluation. Counsel shall jointly call chambers on or before 5/23/2013 to schedule Early Neutral Evaluation. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/20/2013.(mjwcd)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss Party with Prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Matt Hanagan and Craig Tangeman, in both their individual and official capacities, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or her own costs and fees. ORDERED that the caption of this action shall be amended to omit Matt Hanagan and Craig Tangeman as party defendants by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/09/13.(jjhsl, )
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 74 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff Solely to Depose Mike Dieck, Tom Albershardt, Brian Rademacher, and John Glassburner. Amended Scheduling Order 64 is amended. Discovery due by 5/28/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2013.(mjwcd)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The Amended Scheduling Order, as altered, is made an order of the court. The Final Pretrial Conference set for June 6, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for August 12, 2013 at 10:00 a.m, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/13.(sgrim)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 52 Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/09/13.(jjhsl, )
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint (Docket No. 44-1) is accepted as filed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/26/12.(jjhsl, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Parties Unopposed and Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 31 is amended. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/22/2012.(mjwcd)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/22/12. (jjhsl, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 plaintiffs' Unopposed and Joint Motion to VacateAugust 3, 2012 Scheduling Conference and Reschedule Deadlines. Scheduling Conference 8/3/2012 is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/18/2012.(mjwcd)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of Consolidation. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this Order in both cases. ORDERED that all pleadings and other filings shall hereafter be filed in the lower numbered case only, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01103-WYD-MJW, using the caption appearing in this Order. ORDERED that Civil Action No. 11-cv-01107 shall hereafter be referred to the magistrate judge assigned to the lowest case, in this case Magistrate Judge Watanabe (jjhsl, )
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/9/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lips, et al., v. Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgilius Lips
Represented By: Sarah J. Parady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Lips
Represented By: Sarah J. Parady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grayson Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt (I) Hanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Tangeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig (I) Tangeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?