Lips et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County et al
Plaintiff: Melven Lips and Julien Lips
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County, Grayson Robinson, Matt Hanagan, Craig Tangeman, Matt (I) Hanagan and Craig (I) Tangeman
Case Number: 1:2012cv01107
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE with each party to pay its respective costs and attorney fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/21/2014. (evana, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 28 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/26/2014.(mjwcd)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Restrict Access to Exhibits Containing Confidential Information by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/12/13.(jjhsl, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Jason Anderson is DISMISSED from this action. Additionally, all official capacity claims against Defendants Madrigal and Pollack are DISMISSED, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and fees . Accordingly, the Clerk shall amend the case caption to reflect that Defendants Madrigal and Pollack are only being sued in their individual capacities. ORDERED that Defendants Anderson, Madrigal, Croushore and Pollack's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Melvin and Julien Lips (ECF No. 114) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/19/13.(jjhsl, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Case 12-cv-01103-WYD-MJW is no longer consolidated with 12-cv-01107-WYD-MJW. All future filings shall be made in 12-cv-01107-WYD-MJW. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/13. (mnfsl, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Consolidation. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this Order in both cases. ORDERED that all pleadings and other filings shall hereafter be filed in the lower numbered case only, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01103-WYD-MJW, using the c aption appearing in this Order. ORDERED that Civil Action No. 11-cv-01107 shall hereafter be referred to the magistrate judge assigned to the lowest case, in this case Magistrate Judge Watanabe by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/29/12. (jjhsl, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/15/12. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lips et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melven Lips
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Lauren Louise Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julien Lips
Represented By: Lauren Louise Fontana
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Arapahoe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grayson Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Tangeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt (I) Hanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig (I) Tangeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?