Gordineer et al v. Rocky Mountain Offender Management Systems et al
Plaintiff: Tammera Gordineer, Elizabeth Johnson and Nichole Staggs
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Offender Management Systems and Dan Beeck
Case Number: 1:2012cv01212
Filed: May 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Rejecting Stipulation for Approval of Settlment and Dismissal 59 by Judge John L. Kane on 01/27/14. (jhawk, )
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re: 37 Motion to Amend Scheduling and Discovery Order by Judge John L. Kane on 07/18/13.(jjhsl, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Re Conditional Class Certification and Notice granting 26 Motion to Certify Class, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/17/13.(sgrim)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Permit Four Day Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Plaintiffs'Reply shall be filed on or before 1/11/13, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/7/13.(sgrim)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Amend First Stipulated Scheduling and Discovery Order. Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Class Certification shall be filed on or before November 13, 2012. Defendants Response/Opposition to Motion for Conditional Class Certification shall be filed on or before December 17, 2012. Plaintiffs Reply, if any, shall be filed on or before January 7, 2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/31/12. (alvsl)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/17/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordineer et al v. Rocky Mountain Offender Management Systems et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammera Gordineer
Represented By: Diane Vaksdal Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Diane Vaksdal Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Staggs
Represented By: Diane Vaksdal Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Offender Management Systems
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Represented By: Mary L. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Beeck
Represented By: Mary L. Will
Represented By: Daniel David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?