Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The v. Wilds
Plaintiff: |
Guardian Life Insurance Company of America |
Defendant: |
Susan Wilds |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv01215 |
Filed: |
May 9, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Wiley Y. Daniel |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2015 |
Filing
70
FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk that Magistrate Judge Mixs Recommendation ECF Doc. No. 65 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. It is further ORDERED that the Movants Amended Motion to Enforce Attorneys Lien ECF Doc. No. 56 is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that M ovants be awarded $50,160.32, plus interest at the rate set by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from January 28, 2013. It is further ORDERED that the $336,634.93 in the Courts Registry be distributed as follows: $50,160.32, plus interest at the rate set by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from January 28, 2013, to Movants and the remaining amount to Susan Wilds. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/21/2015. (evana, )
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER that Magistrate Judge Mixs Recommendation ECF No. 65 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. As such, the Movants Amended Motion to Enforce Attorneys Lien ECF No. 56 is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Movants be awarded $50,160.32, plus interest a t the rate set by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from January 28, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the $336,634.93 in the Courts Registry be distributed as follows: $50,160.32, plus interest at the rate set by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from January 28, 2013, to Movants and the remaining amount to Susan Wilds. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/16/2014.(evana, )
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
59
Minute Order. ORDERED that the Interested Parties Corrected Motion For Enforcement Of Charging Lien For Attorney's Fees 35 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Mix's Recommendation 47 is MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/07/14.(jjhsl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?