Baek et al. v. ARC International North America Holdings Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Fred Min and Mi Kyong Baek
Defendant: ARC International North America Holdings Inc., ARC International Holdings Inc. and Modny, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01247
Filed: May 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Final Judgment. ORDERED that Judgment shall be entered in favor of the Defendant, Arc International North America Holdings Inc., a Delaware corporation, and against the Plaintiffs, Mi Kyong Baek and Fred Min. ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees. ORDERED that Defendant shall be awarded its cost by the filing of the Bill of Costs within 14 days of entry of judgment by Clerk on 11/06/14. (jhawk, )
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 41 Arc's Motion for Summary Judgment. Arc's Motion forHearing, Doc. 48, is DENIED as MOOT by Judge John L. Kane on 08/04/14.(jhawk, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of judgment against defendant MODNY, Inc., by Judge John L. Kane on 1/24/2014.(trlee, )
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 19 Defendant Arc International Holdings, Inc.'s MotionTo Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and dismiss with prejudice this lawsuit against Arc, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/13/13.(sgrim) (Main Document 27 replaced on 2/13/2013) (sgrim, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baek et al. v. ARC International North America Holdings Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Min
Represented By: Lloyd G. Pearcy
Represented By: Chan Michael Sunoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Kyong Baek
Represented By: Chan Michael Sunoo
Represented By: Lloyd G. Pearcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC International North America Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC International Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modny, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?