Guy v. Jorstad et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Guy
Defendant: Nathan Jorstad, Richard W. Myers, Steven W Cox, City of Colorado Springs, Nathan (I) Jorstad, Steve (I) Cox and Richard (I) Myers
Case Number: 1:2012cv01249
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 96 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Nathan Jorstad are dismissed. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/9/2015. (cpear)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 123 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Briefing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/8/2015.(mlace, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER re: 103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. The Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. 103) is GRANTED and Dennis W. Hartley is removed as counsel of record in this action. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/06/2015. (athom, )
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 4/7/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/15. (sgrim)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re: 87 Joint MOTION for Hearing/Conference filed by Nathan (I) Jorstad, Nathan Jorstad. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this case. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/24/2015. (tscha, )
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Order 40 issued on December 4, 2012, staying this case pending resolution of the Motion is hereby lifted. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/21/2014.(trlee, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 57 Petition Pursuant to 15-11-803(7)(1), by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/9/2014.(trlee, )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 21 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order from Discovery and to Vacate Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery and all deadlines and hearings in this case are hereby stayed pending resolution of 36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within ten days of a ruling on the pending motion to dismiss if any portion of the case remains pending. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/4/12.(mnfsl, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/8/12.(mnfsl, )
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 24-1). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/2/12.(mnfsl, )
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2012 10:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/18/2012. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Jorstad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Guy
Represented By: Dennis W. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Jorstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan (I) Jorstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve (I) Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard (I) Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?