Dicino v. Mink et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dicino
Defendant: Alexandra Garcia, Katherine Feroe, Katherine (I) Feroe, Sean Renfro, Sean (I) Renfro, Webb, Webb (I), Ted Mink, Patsy Mundell, Parks and Alexandra (I) Garcia
Case Number: 1:2012cv01274
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Mixs Recommendation ECF No. 137 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. it is FURTHER ORDERED that Dicinos Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint ECF No. 124 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. it is FURTHER ORDERED that Garcias Motion For Summary Judgment Pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a) ECF No. 135 is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/30/2014.(evana, )
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/28/2014. Motion for Leave to Conduct Depositions of Incarcerated Persons # 160 is GRANTED. ORDERED: Discovery deadline is extended to October 31, 2014. ORDERED: Dispositive motion deadline is November 30, 2014. ORDERED: Final Pretrial Conference set December 8, 2014 is VACATED and RESET to February 25, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom C204. (lgale)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/17/14. Motion for Status Conference 159 is GRANTED. Status Conference set for 7/28/2014 1:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/27/14. Motion Requesting an Amendment to Minute Order 146 is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is extended to July 29, 2014 for the limited purposes of completing depositions and to allow Plaintiff to request issuance of and/or to serve a subpoena for the production of documents. (lgale)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Motion for Blank Subpoenas, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/2013.(skl)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER granting 98 Motion Requesting the Court Enter a Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/18/13.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 9/18/2013 (jjhsl, ).
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER denying 75 Motion for Extension of Time To File Objections To Recommendation Of United States Magistrate Judge and denying as moot 76 Motion Requesting Court To Enter An Order Compelling Defendant Garcia To Serve Plaintiff With A Copy Of Her Objections To The Recommendation Of The United States Magistrate Judgefor Order. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/20/13.(mjgsl, )
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER striking 79 Request for Opposing Parties Written Consent to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/11/13.(jjhsl, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Mix's Recommendation 58 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that defendant, Alexandra Garcias, Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Secon d And Final Amended Prisoner Complaint 45 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that defendant, Sean Renfro's, Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(5) 28 is GRANTED. ORDERED that defendant, Alexandra Garcias, Objections To Recommendation Of United States Magistrate Judge [ECF No. 61] are OVERRULED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/28/13.(jjhsl, )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Drawing Case. this case shall be drawn to a district judge and a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/04/12. (nmmsl, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second and Final Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/19/2012. (skssl, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second and Final Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/18/2012. (skssl, )
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/14/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicino v. Mink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Feroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine (I) Feroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Renfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean (I) Renfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Mink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Mundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra (I) Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?