May 5, 2014 |
Filing
99
FINAL JUDGMENT. re: Order Adopting in Part July 12, 2013 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Dismiss, Sua Spone Dismissing Remaining Defendants, and Closing Case 95 . Final Judgment is entered for Def endants Elizabeth Artemis, Melanie Davies, Kamila Davies, Kimberlee Pratt, Nicole Stanic, Romanee Stanic, Kaitlyn Nolan, Red Lion Hotel Denver Southeast, and Kickstarter.com and against the Plaintiff Larry Elevtherios Johnson. Defendants are awarded costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of Court within fourteen days after entry of Final Judgment, by Deborah A. Hansen, Deputy Clerk on May 5, 2014. (dhans, )
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing
95
ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 84 is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART; Defendants Melanie Davies and Kamila Davies Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ECF No. 38 is DENIED; Defendants Melanie Davies and Kamila Davies Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ECF No. 50 is DENIED; Defendants Nicolle Stanic, Romanee Stanic, Elizabeth Artemis, Kaitlyn Nolan and Kimberlee Pratts Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint ECF No. [ 35] is DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal based on lack of personal or subject matter jurisdiction but GRANTED to the extent it seeks dismissal for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted; Defendants Melanie Davies and Kam ila Davies Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted ECF No. 39 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs copyright claims against Defendants Nicolle Stanic, Romanee Stanic, Elizabeth Artemis, Kaitlyn Nolan, Kimberlee Pratt, Melanie Davies, and Kamila Davies are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted; Plaintiffs copyright claims against Defendants Red Lion Hotel Denver Southeast and Kickstarter.com are sua sponte DISM ISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); The Court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state law claims and Plaintiffs sta te law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Defendants Melanie Davies and Kamila Davies counterclaim is DISMISSED as MOOT; and The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants. Defendants shall have their costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/2/2013.(ervsl, )
|
July 18, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 81 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Plaintiffs Motion to Amend his Amended Complaint ECF No. 77 is DENIED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/18/2013.(ervsl, )
|
May 31, 2013 |
Filing
80
ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 69 is ADOPTED in its entirety; The claims against Defendants Myelin Productions, Axum21st Group Global, Richard Vaz, Summer Brooke, Frances Vaz, Sabrina Vaz, Krista Cox, and Chelsea Humphreys are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to effect service of process within the time constraints set by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 (m). In all future filings, Defendants Myelin Productions, Axum21st Group Global, Richard Vaz, Summer Brooke, Frances Vaz, Sabrina Vaz, Krista Cox, and Chelsea Humphreys shall be removed from the caption, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/31/2013.(ervsl, )
|
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
76
MINUTE ORDER. The Order entered on May 10, 2013 73 is hereby amended. Plaintiff shall respond to the pending motions to dismiss 38 , 39 , 50 by filing such response on the docket on or before May 31, 2013. No extension of time will be granted on this deadline, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/15/2013.(wjmcd, )
|
April 18, 2013 |
Filing
70
MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 45 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend his First Amended Complaint to Include RICO Violations Pursuant to U.S.C. 1961 [sic] and to Add the Following Defendants: Denver Red Lion Hotel Southeast, Kelly Barrett, Sage Porter; and denying 44 Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate State Claims of Civil Theft, et al, in Boulder District Court With Its [sic] Fedeal [sic] Claims of Copyright Infringement and Racketeering, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/18/2013.(ervsl, )
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
68
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 63 Order to Show Cause; It is hereby ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause 63 is made ABSOLUTE. The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the claims against Defendants Myelin Productio ns, Axum 21st Group Global, Richard Vaz, Summer Brooke, Frances Vaz, Sabrina Vaz, Krista Cox and Chelsea Humphreys be DISMISSED without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/3/2013. (klmcd, )(Modified on 4/4/2013 This has been refiled using a corrected event at Docket 69 )(ervsl, ).
|
August 7, 2012 |
Filing
19
ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that named Defendants Sr. Gregory A.N. Coons, Chris Artemis, Nancy Artemis, Laurel Jameson, Shawn Nolan, and Hayes Byrd are dismissed as parties to the a ction. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Johnson's claims against Defendants Axum21st Group Global, Melanie Davies, Kamila Davies, Richard Vaz, Frances Vaz, Sabrina Vaz, Kimberlee Pratt, Chelsea Humphreys, Summer Brooke, Krista Cox, Kaitlyn Nolan, Nicolle Stanic, Romanee Stanic, Elizabeth Artemis, and Myelin Productions, as described above, shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/7/12. (lygsl, )
|
June 29, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/29/2012. (skssl, )
|
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
6
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/25/2012. (skssl, )
|