Pena v. Hartley et al
Petitioner: Jose Arturo Pena
Respondent: S. Hartley and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2012cv01363
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The, S. Hartley against Jose Arturo Pena re: 44 Order, by Clerk on 5/20/2015. (evana, )
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re: 37 USCA Mandate. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this civil action is reinstated pursuant to the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit filed on October 31, 2014. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty days, Respondents are directed to file an answer in compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of claims 2(c) and 4. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a traverse, if any, and only a traverse, may be filed within thirty days of the filing of the answer. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/1/2014. (evana, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying 26 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (Titled as an Application for Certificate of Appealability) and 27 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 28 Notice of Appeal by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/3/13.(dbrow, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 24 Order. By Clerk on 5/29/13. (mnfsl, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Application. Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Claims 2(c) and 4 and Objection to Court's Partial Dismissal of Those Claims 23 is Denied. ORDERED that the habeas corpus application is DENIED, and the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIEDby Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/28/13.(jjhsl, )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and for Answer. ORDERED that Claims 2(a), 2(b), 2(c), 3, 4, 5, and 7 are DISMISSED. ORDERED that within thirty (30) days Respondents are directed to file an answer in compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of exhausted Claims 1, 2(d) and 6. ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the filing of the answer Applicant may file a reply, if he desires by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/04/12. (jjhsl, )
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/07/2012. (skssl, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/25/2012. (skssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Hartley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Arturo Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?