Pesick v. Vitamin Cottage Natural Foods Market, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Mary Rose Pesick
Defendant: Vitamin Cottage Natural Foods Market, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01368
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER The parties have filed a Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice. After careful review of the stipulation and the file, the court has concluded that the stipulation should be approved and that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant should be dismissed with prejudice. THEREFORE IT IS ORDERED as follows: That the Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice is APPROVED; and That Plaintiffs claims against the Defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his, her, or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/14/2013.(ervsl, )
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Granting Motion to Consolidate, Vacating Order of Reference and Setting Status Conference re 20 and 21 : Civil Action 12-cv-02611-WYD-KLM is consolidated with this action. The Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix in Civil Action No. 12-cv-02611-WYD-KLM is vacated. A status conference in the consolidated cases will be held on March 7, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. in the Conference Room. The existing orders in both cases will be reviewed at that conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2013.(rpmcd) Modified on 1/28/2013 (rpmcd ).
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Amend Caption: to substitute the name "Mary Rose Muniz" for the name "Mary Rose Pesick,", by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/19/2012.(rpmcd )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 13 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/3/2012. (rpmcd)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulated 8 Motion to Dismiss Party Natural Grocers by Vitamin Cottage, Inc. with prejudice and shall be removed from the caption, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/22/2012.(rpmcd)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/3/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 26, 2012, lead counsel present in person, no parties or representatives of parties permitted to attend and counsel for the defendant shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/19/2012. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pesick v. Vitamin Cottage Natural Foods Market, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rose Pesick
Represented By: Mark S. Bove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitamin Cottage Natural Foods Market, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?