Lamm v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamm
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Yarway Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., Montello, Inc., Invensys Systems, Inc., Crosby Valve, Inc., Crane Co., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Barksdale, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Warren Pumps, LLC., General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Aurora Pump Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Carrier Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., The William Powell Company, Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Viad Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, O.C. Keckley Company, Flowserve US, Inc., Robertshaw Controls Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, The Nash Engineering Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, IMO Industries, Inc. and Crane Environmental, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01374
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Archuleta
Presiding Judge: David M Ebel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #128 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/25/12.(lygsl, )
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER granting #126 Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Certificate of Compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) and 83.3(d) filed by Armstrong International, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/24/12. (lygsl, )
July 24, 2012 Filing 129 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Valerie A. Garcia on behalf of The Nash Engineering Company (Garcia, Valerie)
July 24, 2012 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 by Plaintiff Ronald Lamm. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Keating, Michael)
July 23, 2012 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM regarding #126 Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Certificate of Compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) and 83.3(d) filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/23/12. Text Only Entry (lygsl, )
July 23, 2012 Filing 126 Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Certificate of Compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) and 83.3(d) by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Fowler, Daniel)
July 19, 2012 Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calhoun, Ashley)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #122 Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.'s Motion for Substitution of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/18/2012. (mehcd)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM regarding #122 MOTION for Order to Substitute Counsel filed by Armstrong International, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/18/12. Text Only Entry (lygsl, )
July 18, 2012 Filing 122 MOTION for Order to Substitute Counsel by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McLetchie, Andrew)
July 17, 2012 Filing 121 Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Armstrong International, Inc..(McLetchie, Andrew)
July 17, 2012 Filing 120 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McLetchie, Andrew)
July 17, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel McKay Fowler on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Fowler, Daniel)
July 17, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew R. McLetchie on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (McLetchie, Andrew)
July 17, 2012 Filing 117 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc..(Brown, Dennis)
July 16, 2012 Filing 116 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 114 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Aurora Pump Company.(Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Velan Valve Corporation.(Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 110 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation.(Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 109 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 108 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Trane US, Inc..(Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calhoun, Ashley)
July 16, 2012 Filing 106 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Calhoun, Ashley) Modified on 7/17/2012 to create linkage (lygsl, ).
July 16, 2012 Filing 105 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by O.C. Keckley Company.(Pruett, Richard)
July 16, 2012 Filing 104 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Blackmer Pump Company.(Pruett, Richard)
July 16, 2012 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Baker Hughes Incorporated, Corporate Parent Western Atlas, Inc for Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.. (Brown, Dennis)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER granting #99 the Unopposed Motion for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond on Behalf of Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation.... Defendant Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation's answer to the #1 Complaint due by 7/16/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/9/2012. (mehcd)
July 9, 2012 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM regarding #99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complainty filed by Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/9/12. Text Only Entry (lygsl, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Setter on behalf of Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation (Setter, David)
July 6, 2012 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Calhoun, Ashley)
July 6, 2012 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stalzer, Kenneth)
July 6, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Edward Stalzer on behalf of General Electric Company (Stalzer, Kenneth)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/3/12. (sgrim)
July 3, 2012 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hawes, Mollie)
July 2, 2012 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stalzer, Kenneth)
July 2, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Edward Stalzer on behalf of Viad Corporation (Stalzer, Kenneth)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Of Recusal. Case reassigned to Judge David M. Ebel for all further proceedings. Judge Marcia S. Krieger no longer assigned to case. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/2/12. (mjgsl, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holding, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Hensley, John) Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re: corporate parent (wjcsl, ).
June 27, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Setter on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Setter, David)
June 27, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Setter on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Setter, David)
June 27, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Setter on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Setter, David)
June 27, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Setter on behalf of Ingersoll Rand Company (Setter, David)
June 27, 2012 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Pray, Susan)
June 27, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Setter on behalf of Trane US, Inc. (Setter, David)
June 27, 2012 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #42 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Pray, Susan)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER granting #80 Motion Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Anchor/Darling Valve Company. Anchor Darling Valve Company answer due 7/26/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/27/2012.(wjcsl, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stacy Deanne Titus on behalf of Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Titus, Stacy)
June 27, 2012 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM regarding #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Anchor Darling Valve Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/27/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant Anchor Darling Valve Company. (Morales, Victor)
June 26, 2012 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Garrison, Christine)
June 26, 2012 Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Garrison, Christine)
June 26, 2012 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Garrison, Christine)
June 26, 2012 Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Garrison, Christine)
June 26, 2012 Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Grundfos Holding AG for Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC. (Garrison, Christine)
June 26, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary M. Clexton on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Clexton, Gary)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond on Behalf of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. The Defendant named herein shall file an answer or other response to the operative Complaint in this matter on or before July 17, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/26/12.(mjgsl, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ranco Inc., Corporate Parent Invensys plc for Robertshaw Controls Co.. (Eloranto, Sandy)
June 26, 2012 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US, Inc.. (Eloranto, Sandy)
June 26, 2012 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Robertshaw Controls Co..(Eloranto, Sandy)
June 26, 2012 Filing 69 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Flowserve US, Inc..(Eloranto, Sandy)
June 26, 2012 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM regarding #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Armstrong International, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/26/2012. Text Only Entry (wjcsl, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc..(Hensley, John)
June 26, 2012 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by FMC Corporation.(Garrison, Christine)
June 26, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John F. Hensley on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Hensley, John)
June 26, 2012 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Keckley Company for O.C. Keckley Company. (Pruett, Richard) Modified on 6/26/2012 to add text re: corporate parent (wjcsl, ).
June 26, 2012 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Blackmer Pump Company. (Pruett, Richard)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Stipulated Motion for 21-Day Extension to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading on Behalf of Defendant Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations. Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. answer due 7/17/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/25/2012.(wjcsl, )
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Jerguson Gage & Valve Company and Spirax Sarco, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Jerguson Gage & Valve Company answer due 7/25/2012; Spirax Sarco, Inc. answer due 7/25/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/25/2012.(wjcsl, )
June 25, 2012 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC.(Garrison, Christine)
June 25, 2012 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Crosby Valve, Inc., FMC Corporation.(Garrison, Christine)
June 25, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE re #31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, of Supplemental Certificate of Service by Defendants Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Montgomery, C.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Pray, Susan) Modified on 6/26/2012 to add text re corporate parent (wjcsl, ).
June 25, 2012 Filing 56 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Aurora Pump Company answer due 6/25/2012. (Calhoun, Ashley)
June 25, 2012 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by John Crane, Inc..(Hawes, Mollie)
June 25, 2012 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler AG (Switzerland), Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler LLC (Delaware for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Weaver, Charles)
June 25, 2012 Filing 53 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company. Ingersoll Rand Company answer due 6/25/2012. (Calhoun, Ashley)
June 25, 2012 Filing 52 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. Gardner Denver, Inc. answer due 6/25/2012. (Calhoun, Ashley)
June 25, 2012 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. Velan Valve Corporation answer due 6/25/2012. (Calhoun, Ashley)
June 25, 2012 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AWH Corporation for Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Weaver, Charles)
June 25, 2012 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Trane US, Inc.. Trane US, Inc. answer due 6/25/2012. (Calhoun, Ashley)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/12. Text Only Entry (mskcd)
June 25, 2012 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corp. for Carrier Corporation. (Eloranto, Sandy)
June 25, 2012 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
June 25, 2012 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Carrier Corporation.(Eloranto, Sandy)
June 25, 2012 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM regarding #31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
June 25, 2012 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Blackmer Pump Company, O.C. Keckley Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/25/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
June 25, 2012 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Pray, Susan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 41 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. Armstrong International, Inc. answer due 7/17/2012. (Event changed into a Motion for 21-Day Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond.)(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Maywhort, William) Modified on 6/26/2012 to change event into a motion (wjcsl, ).
June 25, 2012 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Curry, Grant)
June 25, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. by Grant Robert Curry on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Curry, Grant)
June 25, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by The William Powell Company.(Curry, Grant)
June 25, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of The William Powell Company by Grant Robert Curry on behalf of The William Powell Company (Curry, Grant)
June 25, 2012 Filing 36 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Brown, Dennis)
June 25, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dennis W. Brown on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. (Brown, Dennis)
June 25, 2012 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Viad Corporation.(Jost, LaMar)
June 25, 2012 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by General Electric Company.(Jost, LaMar)
June 22, 2012 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company, The for Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2012 to add text (wjcsl, ).
June 22, 2012 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Counter Defendants Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Montgomery, C.)
June 22, 2012 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dana Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Dana Corporation for Dana Companies LLC. (Birk, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2012 to add text (wjcsl, ).
June 22, 2012 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Birk, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2012 to add text (wjcsl, ).
June 22, 2012 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Corporate Parent Buffalo Pumps Division of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Birk, Mary) Modified on 6/25/2012 to add text (wjcsl, ).
June 22, 2012 Filing 25 DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Union Carbide Corporation.(Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 24 DEFENDANT MONTELLO, INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Montello, Inc..(Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 23 DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Dana Companies LLC.(Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 22 DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 21 DEFENDANT CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Cameron International Corporation.(Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 20 DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Birk, Mary)
June 22, 2012 Filing 19 Hopeman Brothers, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, and Jury Demand by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..(Weaver, Charles)
June 22, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by C. Michael Montgomery on behalf of Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Montgomery, C.)
June 22, 2012 Filing 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time D.C.Colo.LCiv.R 6.1 by Defendants Blackmer Pump Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Pruett, Richard) Modified on 6/25/2012 to edit text to clarify title of document (wjcsl, ).
June 21, 2012 Filing 16 ANSWER Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand of CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electronic to #1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Jury Demand, by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT)(Garrison, Christine) Modified on 6/22/2012 to edit text to clarify title of document (wjcsl, ).
June 20, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Weaver, Charles)
June 20, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard W. Pruett on behalf of O.C. Keckley Company (Pruett, Richard)
June 15, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Price Birk on behalf of Montello, Inc. (Birk, Mary)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/2012. (mehcd)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/12/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF DEATH of Statement Noting a Party's Death by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Pruett, Richard)
June 8, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dennis Markusson and Richard Pruett by Richard W. Pruett on behalf of Blackmer Pump Company (Pruett, Richard)
May 30, 2012 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Order. This case is reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-01374-MSK-MEH. Text Only Entry (mnfsl, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON ADMITTED ATTORNEY. The court construes that Darren P. McDowell has entered an appearance as an attorney in this case based on signing a document filed in this case. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 11.1A, an attorney must be a member of the court's bar to make an appearance in a case before the court. The attorney records of the court do not reflect that counsel is a member of the bar. Unless an application for admission to the bar of the court or a motion to withdraw in this case is received within 20 days of the date of this entry, further action may be taken by the court. Text Only Entry (mjfsl, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/29/12. (mnfsl, )
May 29, 2012 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-01374-CMA-MEH. Text Only Entry (rpmcd)
May 29, 2012 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by District Judge Matsch. (rpmcd)
May 25, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., Barksdale, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Cameron International Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Crane Environmental, Inc., Crosby Valve, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dana Companies LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Montello, Inc., O.C. Keckley Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Co., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation, The Nash Engineering Company, The William Powell Company, Trane US, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Yarway Corporation (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-2861106), filed by Ronald Lamm. (Attachments: #1 Summons Air & Liquid Systems, #2 Summons Anchor Darling Valve, #3 Summons Armstrong, #4 Summons Aurora Pump, #5 Summons Baker Hughes, #6 Summons Barksdale, #7 Summons Blackmer Pump, #8 Summons Cameron, #9 Summons Carrier, #10 Summons CBS, #11 Summons Cleaver-Brooks, #12 Summons Crane Co., #13 Summons Crane Environmental, #14 Summons Crosby Valve, #15 Summons Crown Cork & Seal, #16 Summons Dana Companies, #17 Summons Flowserve, #18 Summons FMC, #19 Summons Foster Wheeler, #20 Summons Garner Denver, #21 Summons General Electric, #22 Summons Goulds Pumps, #23 Summons Hopeman Bros, #24 Summons IMO, #25 Summons Ingersoll Rand, #26 Summons Invensys, #27 Summons Jerguson, #28 Summons John Crane, #29 Summons Metropolitan Life, #30 Summons Montello, #31 Summons The Nash Engineering, #32 Summons O.C. Keckley, #33 Summons Parker-Hannifin, #34 Summons Robertshaw, #35 Summons Spirax Sarco, #36 Summons Sterling Fluid, #37 Summons Superior-Lidgerwood, #38 Summons Trane, #39 Summons Union Carbide, #40 Summons Velan Valve, #41 Summons Viad Corp, #42 Summons Viking Pump, #43 Summons Warren Pumps, #44 Summons Weir Valves, #45 Summons The William Powell, #46 Summons Yarway Corp, #47 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keating, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamm v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Represented By: David M. Setter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: C. Michael Montgomery
Represented By: Stacy Deanne Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Represented By: David M. Setter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montello, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invensys Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, Inc.
Represented By: Christine McCallister Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barksdale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Richard W. Pruett
Represented By: Dennis Hart Markusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Darling Valve Company
Represented By: Victor M. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Stalzer
Represented By: LaMar Fredrick Jost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Represented By: David M. Setter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Represented By: David M. Setter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Grant Robert Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Represented By: David M. Setter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Represented By: William W. Maywhort
Represented By: Andrew R. McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage & Valve Company
Represented By: C. Michael Montgomery
Represented By: Stacy Deanne Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Stalzer
Represented By: LaMar Fredrick Jost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Gary M. Clexton
Represented By: Mollie B. Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Christine McCallister Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.C. Keckley Company
Represented By: Richard W. Pruett
Represented By: Dennis Hart Markusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Co.
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan G. Pray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles Edward Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Christine McCallister Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Valerie Ann Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Robert Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Represented By: David M. Setter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christine McCallister Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC
Represented By: Christine McCallister Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Environmental, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamm
Represented By: Darren Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Michael O'Brien Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?